Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:22-cv-00203
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2022
Terminated:Jan 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2022 8:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Kathleen A. Smith
Defendant
Willis
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Defendant
Adam Rosenberg
Defendant
Tammy Powell
Defendant
Marcus Moore
Defendant
Lucy Larkin
Defendant
Hendry Regional Medical Center
Defendant
Amira D. Fox
Defendant
Jill Cabai
Defendant
Officer Taylor
Defendant
Sergeant Taylor
Defendant
Kevin Sullivan
Defendant
Rebecca Ann Myer
Defendant
Officer Kelly
Defendant
Mr. Guzman
Defendant
Kimberly Barrineau
Defendant
Michael Baker
Defendant
Sheriff Steve Whidden
Defendant
State of Florida
Defendant
Sergeant Demetrius Scruggs
Defendant
Cheif Thomas Lewis
Plaintiff
Christine Scott
212 E. Hillsboro Blvd. #212
Deerfield Beach, FL 33441


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
25 25 misc Judgment Mon 01/23 2:01 PM
JUDGMENT. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SEH)
Related: [-]
24 24 7 pgs order Order dismissing case Tue 01/17 2:49 PM
ORDER dismissing 23 Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted and under Rules 8 and 10 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions, close this file, and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/17/2023. (KLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/25 8:27 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Christine Scott. Related document: 21 Amended Complaint, filed by Christine Scott.(JK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
22 22 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/10 3:08 PM
ORDER. Christine Scott's Amended Complaint (Doc. 21) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Her application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE also. On or before August 24, 2022, Ms. Scott may file a second amended complaint that complies with this Order and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court warns Ms. Scott that no further amendments will be allowed and failure to cure the identified pleading deficiencies will result in dismissal of this case. The Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Doc. 7) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE subject to Ms. Scott renewing her motion, if appropriate, in consideration of this Order and after amending her pleading. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/10/2022. (NM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/08 8:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Christine Scott. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Christine Scott.(JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 07/26 8:53 AM
ORDER denying 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend re 1 Complaint. Within 10 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall either file and amended complaint that complies with the Court's 5/2/2022 order to amend or file a notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 7/26/2022. (KLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Amend Tue 07/19 11:16 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re1 Complaint by Christine Scott. (JK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Thu 06/30 10:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to amend her complaint. 17 . Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by July 19, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 6/30/2022. (LTG)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 26, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 06/27 11:18 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re1 Complaint by Christine Scott. (JK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 06/06 9:58 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by June 27, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 6/6/2022. (LTG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 06/03 1:16 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Christine Scott. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 05/18 8:11 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by June 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 5/18/2022. (LTG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 05/16 3:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Christine Scott. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Tue 05/10 11:59 AM
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the court's Guide for Proceeding Without a Lawyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 5/10/2022. (KLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
11 11 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/05 1:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to Change Status to the extent that Plaintiff was provided a copy of the Civil Action Order for non-incarcerated plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 5/5/2022. (LTG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
10 10 5 pgs order Order to file amended complaint Mon 05/02 11:13 AM
ORDER to file amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 5/2/2022. (KLM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
9 9 order Civil Action Order Wed 04/20 9:55 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/20/2022. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/19 1:59 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Change Plaintiff's Status from Incarcerated to Non-Prisoner Status by Christine Scott. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/19 11:28 AM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Christine Scott.(jmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, April 07, 2022
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 04/07 3:54 PM
MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Christine Scott. (jmc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/07 10:01 AM
NOTICE that Plaintiff is not Incarcerated by Christine Scott (jmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
4 4 order Civil Action Order Wed 04/06 11:49 AM
CIVIL Action Order for Confined Plaintiff. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/6/2022. (jmc)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing order pro se litigants Wed 04/06 11:47 AM
STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/6/2022. (jmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/05 10:12 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Christine Scott. (jmc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/05 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christine Scott. IFP filed. No service copies. (jmc)
Related: [-]