Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rebecca Beach Smith
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:22-cv-00136
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Oct 28, 2022
Case in other court:Chesapeake Circuit Court, CL22-1434
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Anthony Elbert
both individually and in his official capacity as City of Chesapeake Police Officer 304 Albemarle Drive
Chesapeake, VA 23322
Represented By
Ellen Frances Bergren
Chesapeake City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chanel Ann Gray
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Jacob Paul Stroman, IV
City Of Chesapeake
contact info
Defendant
Keijon James
both individually and in his official capacity as City of Chesapeake Police Officer 304 Albemarle Drive
Chesapeake, VA 23322
Represented By
Ellen Frances Bergren
Chesapeake City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chanel Ann Gray
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Jacob Paul Stroman, IV
City Of Chesapeake
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Officers
Represented By
Ellen Frances Bergren
Chesapeake City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chanel Ann Gray
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Jacob Paul Stroman, IV
City Of Chesapeake
contact info
Defendant
Larry Stepney
both individually and in his official capacity as City of Chesapeake Police Officer 304 Albemarle Drive
Chesapeake, VA 23322
Represented By
Ellen Frances Bergren
Chesapeake City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chanel Ann Gray
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Jacob Paul Stroman, IV
City Of Chesapeake
contact info
Plaintiff
Russell Witowski
Represented By
Eric Leckie
Invictus Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The City of Chesapeake Police Department
Terminated: 04/26/2022
Represented By
Ellen Frances Bergren
Chesapeake City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chanel Ann Gray
Office Of The City Attorney
contact info
Jacob Paul Stroman, IV
City Of Chesapeake
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 28, 2022
18 18 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/28 4:14 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER. Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 10/28/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Thu 10/27 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Russell Witowski(Leckie, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 13, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/13 9:28 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff shall complete his depositions of fact witnesses by October 25, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 10/13/22. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
15 15 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 10/12 2:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Russell Witowski. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 10/12 2:38 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge:14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/11 2:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Russell Witowski.(Leckie, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/11 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon K Fellers on behalf of Russell Witowski (Fellers, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
12 12 order Settlement Conference Order Tue 05/24 12:48 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement conference scheduled for 11/14/22 at 1:30pm; memorandum due by noon on 11/7/22; see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 5/24/22. (bpet, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
11 11 6 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/20 11:20 AM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith. Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Norfolk before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 5/19/2022. (vwar)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference-Rule16b Thu 05/19 11:27 AM
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 5/19/2022. (tamarm, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/19 12:47 PM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Norfolk Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (btit)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/12 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chanel Ann Gray on behalf of Anthony Elbert, Keijon James, John Doe Officers, Larry Stepney, The City of Chesapeake Police Department (Gray, Chanel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
9 9 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Tue 05/03 8:45 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2022 at 09:30 AM by conference call to be initiated by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 5/2/2022. (tamarm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
misc Refer for 16 b Wed 04/27 8:56 AM
Refer for 16(b) (bpet, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/26 4:36 PM
ORDER granting5 Defendant City of Chesapeake Police Department's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 4/26/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
7 7 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/25 5:29 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Russell Witowski. (Leckie, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
6 6 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 04/11 4:30 PM
Memorandum in Support re5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Chesapeake Police Department. (Bergren, Ellen)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/11 4:27 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Chesapeake Police Department. (Bergren, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/05 11:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony Elbert, Keijon James, John Doe Officers, Larry Stepney.(Bergren, Ellen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/05 3:51 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by City of Chesapeake Police Department, Anthony Elbert, Keijon James, John Doe Officers, Larry Stepney. (Bergren, Ellen)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Mag Notice / Judge Information Tue 04/05 2:37 PM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/05 2:00 PM
Notice of Removal by Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8329670.), filed by Anthony Elbert, City of Chesapeake Police Department, Larry Stepney, Keijon James.(Bergren, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/05 2:35 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 04/05 2:52 PM
Notice of Correction re1 Notice of Removal. A Civil Cover Sheet should have been attached to your initiating document. The filing user is thus notified to file a Civil Cover Sheet. (epri, )
Related: [-]