Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:22-cv-00547
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Mar 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 4:46 AM MST
Defendant
Duncan Corley
Represented By
Sharron Ash
Hamburger Law Firm LLC
contact info
Sarah Martin Humble
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Sean James O'Hara
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jason Miller
Represented By
Sharron Ash
Hamburger Law Firm LLC
contact info
Sarah Martin Humble
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Sean James O'Hara
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Louise Goudy Willmering
Represented By
Sharron Ash
Hamburger Law Firm LLC
contact info
Sarah Martin Humble
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Sean James O'Hara
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kris Yamano
Represented By
Sharron Ash
Hamburger Law Firm LLC
contact info
Sarah Martin Humble
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Sean James O'Hara
Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By
James H Ferrick, III
Greensfelder Hemker & Gale PC
contact info
Sharon Wei Ming Ng
Stinson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Kathleen M Howard
Greensfelder Hemker & Gale PC
contact info
Michael Anthony Vincent
Stinson Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Caroline B Paillou
Greensfelder Hemker & Gale PC
contact info
Christopher A Pickett
Greensfelder Hemker & Gale PC
contact info

GPO Oct 03 2022
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 15) is granted in part and denied in part. Counts III, VI, and VII are dismissed. 2. BMO may file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") within 21 days of the issuance of this order, with the scope of amendment limited as discussed above. If BMO files a FAC, it shall, consistent with LRCiv 15.1(a), attach a redlined version of the pleading as an exhibit [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/3/22. (MAW)
GPO Feb 13 2023
ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion to stay (Doc. 36) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, this case having settled, all hearings and deadlines are vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall, by February 24, 2023, file a stipulation of dismissal. If, after review of this order and relevant case law, the parties believe the Court should retain ancillary jurisdiction over the dismissed action, they may include argument in support of this request in their stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the parties fail to file a stipulation of dismissal seeking retention of ancillary jurisdiction, the action will be dismissed without retention of jurisdiction, and the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further order of the Court [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/13/23. (MAW)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
38 38 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/01 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to37 Order regarding filing a stipulation of dismissal and no stipulation having been filed, the civil case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 02/13 1:41 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion to stay (Doc.36 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, this case having settled, all hearings and deadlines are vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall, by February 24, 2023, file a stipulation of dismissal. If, after review of this order and relevant case law, the parties believe the Court should retain ancillary jurisdiction over the dismissed action, they may include argument in support of this request in their stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the parties fail to file a stipulation of dismissal seeking retention of ancillary jurisdiction, the action will be dismissed without retention of jurisdiction, and the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further order of the Court [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/13/23. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
36 36 motion Stay Fri 02/10 9:15 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay by BMO Harris Bank NA.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/01 1:24 PM
NOTICE re: Firm Name Change and Withdrawal of Counsel by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano . (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 12/13 10:56 AM
ORDER- IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Withdraw of attorney Caroline B. Paillou (Doc.33 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/12/22. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
33 33 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 12/09 12:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BMO Harris Bank NA.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 03, 2022
32 32 23 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 10/03 1:46 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc.15 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Counts III, VI, and VII are dismissed. 2. BMO may file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") within 21 days of the issuance of this order, with the scope of amendment limited as discussed above. If BMO files a FAC, it shall, consistent with LRCiv 15.1(a), attach a redlined version of the pleading as an exhibit [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/3/22. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 08/19 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 08/19 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 08/10 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
28 28 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/27 1:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/7/2023. Dispositive motions due by 8/4/2023 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/27/22. (MAW)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order Wed 07/27 1:32 PM
ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc.26 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 12 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/27/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
26 26 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 07/26 12:50 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 07/11 6:08 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 07/01 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 06/30 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/13 3:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/06 10:59 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Order on Motion to Expedite Tue 05/31 4:48 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dominic W Lanza: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2022. Argument held. For reasons as stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery (Doc.16 ). APPEARANCES: Kathleen Howard, James Ferrick and Michael Vincent (all appearing telephonically) for Plaintiff. Sharron Ash (appearing telephonically) and Sean O'Hara for Defendants. (Court Reporter Candy Potter) Hearing held 3:02 PM to 3:55 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 05/31 12:31 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James H Ferrick, III on behalf of Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/27 2:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:16 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/27 1:05 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a status hearing on the motion to expedite discovery (Doc.16 ) is set for 5/31/2022 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel may either appear in person or telephonically for said hearing. Counsel are directed to notify the Court no later than 5:00 p.m., 5/27/2022 whether they wish to appear telephonically or will be appearing in person for said hearing. The call-in information is as follows: (866) 390-1828; Access code: 9667260. Speaker phones, headsets and connections through the internet are not permitted. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/27/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/23 3:39 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Request for Expedited Consideration by BMO Harris Bank NA re:16 MOTION to Expedite Discovery . (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Expedite Mon 05/23 3:34 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by BMO Harris Bank NA.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Mon 05/23 10:57 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Duncan Corley. (O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
14 14 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/20 11:45 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BMO Harris Bank NA.(Pickett, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 05, 2022
13 13 order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/05 3:22 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation to extend the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint (Doc.12 ) is granted. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 23, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/5/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Wed 05/04 11:20 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano.(O'Hara, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 05/04 11:13 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Sharron Ash on behalf of Defendants Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 04/21 3:36 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Douglas L Rayes recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic W Lanza for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 22-00547 PHX-DWL. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/19/2022. (RMV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
10 10 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/19 7:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 22-00547 PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
9 9 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Tue 04/19 7:35 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Service Executed Mon 04/18 3:01 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BMO Harris Bank NA: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint upon Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Willmering, Kris Yamato on 04/14/2022. (Ng, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 04/13 11:39 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Caroline B Paillou on behalf of Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 04/12 10:02 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher A Pickett, Kathleen M Howard on behalf of Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/05 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
4 4 misc New Case Opened Tue 04/05 3:08 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20522157. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 22-00547 PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Submitted Tue 04/05 3:03 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Duncan Corley, Jason Miller, Louise Goudy Willmering, Kris Yamano. (Ng, Sharon)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/05 2:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Ng, Sharon) (BAC)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/05 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20522157 filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Ng, Sharon)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibits A-F