Original Case: 3:21-cv-01483

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-pcf-10329
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Falkbuilt, Incorporated
Represented By
Artemis D. Vamianakis
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Tanner James Bean
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Martha Hardwick Hofmeister
Shackelford, Bowen, McKinley & Norton, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Falkbuilt Limited
Represented By
Artemis D. Vamianakis
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Tanner James Bean
Fabian VanCott
contact info
Martha Hardwick Hofmeister
Shackelford, Bowen, McKinley & Norton, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DIRTT Environmental Solutions, Incorporated
Represented By
Robert E. Weitzel
Akerman, L.L.P.
contact info
Catherine A. Miller
Akerman, L.L.P.
contact info
Jeffrey J. Mayer
Akerman, L.L.P.
contact info

GPO Apr 16 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-10329 Affirmed ] Judge: EBC , Judge: LHS , Judge: JCH Mandate issue date is 05/08/2024; denying Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellant DIRTT Environmental Solutions, Incorporated [10262243-2], denying Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellant DIRTT Environmental Solutions, Incorporated [10252159-2] [22-10329]

Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 4:14 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant DIRTT Environmental Solutions, Incorporated 22-10329 (CAS)
Related: [-]