Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:22-mc-00062
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2022
Terminated:Nov 30, 2022
In Re
Palantir Technologies Inc.
Respondent
Marc L. Abramowitz

GPO Jun 30 2022
ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO OBTAIN DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782(Dkt. #1) by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 30 June 2022. Palantir's request under 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to obtain a deposition of Mr. Abramowitz and subpoena documents from his American counsel is improper because it seeks attorney-client privileged information and attorney work product. Mr. Abramowitz's the attorney-client privilege has not been waived with respect to this information. I have also reviewed in camera the disputed documents anddo not find any basis to find that the crime-fraud exception to the attorney-client privilege would apply. Because the application seeks attorney-client privileged information as to which no exception applies, granting the application would violate 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and constitute an undue burden under the discretionary factors listed by the Supreme Court. Therefore, Petitioner Palantirs application is DENIED.(cmadr, )

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Wed 11/30 3:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc.. (Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/02 10:02 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to33 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice on 11/30/2022. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
32 32 motion Leave Fri 08/05 8:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of 25 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re24 Order on Motion for Order,,, by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc.. by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc..(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, August 04, 2022
31 31 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 08/04 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew S. Rublin on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc.Attorney Matthew S. Rublin added to party Palantir Technologies Inc.(pty:inre) (Rublin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 08/04 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Maria Slobodchikova on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc.Attorney Maria Slobodchikova added to party Palantir Technologies Inc.(pty:inre) (Slobodchikova, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/03 10:08 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/3/2022 re:28 Motion to Withdraw Olivia P. Greene as Counsel for Applicant Palantir Technologies Inc. is GRANTED. Attorney Olivia P. Greene is terminated from this case. Text Only Entry(pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 08/02 2:10 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to Withdraw Olivia P. Greene as Counsel for Applicant Palantir Technologies Inc.) by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc.. (Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
27 27 respm Response to Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision Thu 07/28 1:48 PM
RESPONSE to25 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by Respondent Marc L. Abramowitz.(Romero, Tobin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Supplemental Jorgensen Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 First Supplemental Sessler Declaration
26 26 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 07/28 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tobin J. Romero on behalf of Marc L. AbramowitzAttorney Tobin J. Romero added to party Marc L. Abramowitz(pty:res) (Romero, Tobin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
25 25 motion Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Thu 07/14 8:59 PM
OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re24 Order on Motion for Order,,, by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc..(Livshiz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, June 30, 2022
24 24 37 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Thu 06/30 2:15 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO OBTAIN DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782(Dkt. #1 ) by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 30 June 2022. Palantir's request under 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to obtain a deposition of Mr. Abramowitz and subpoena documents from his American counsel is improper because it seeks attorney-client privileged information and attorney work product. Mr. Abramowitz's the attorney-client privilege has not been waived with respect to this information. I have also reviewed in camera the disputed documents anddo not find any basis to find that the crime-fraud exception to the attorney-client privilege would apply. Because the application seeks attorney-client privileged information as to which no exception applies, granting the application would violate 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and constitute an undue burden under the discretionary factors listed by the Supreme Court. Therefore, Petitioner Palantirs application is DENIED.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 12, 2022
23 23 misc Transcript Sun 06/12 7:14 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on may 25, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Neureiter. Pages: 1-74. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
22 22 misc Response Wed 06/08 3:52 PM
RESPONSE to21 Notice (Other) by Marc L. Abramowitz of New Order in Related Case by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc..(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Waldeck Second Supplemental Declaration
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/07 7:45 PM
NOTICE by Respondent Marc L. Abramowitz(McNichols, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, May 26, 2022
20 20 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 2 - Viewable by Filer & Court Thu 05/26 2:20 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Respondent Marc L. Abramowitz.. (Jorgensen, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
19 19 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Order Wed 05/25 2:45 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2022. By close of business on May 26, 2022, Respondent's Counsel shall file under level 2 restriction, the two emails at issue for in camera review. Palantir Technologies Inc.'s Application and Petition for an Order Pursuant to 28 USC § 1782 to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings (Dkt. #1 ) is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court will issue a written recommendation in due course. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/19 7:26 PM
REPLY to Response to1 MOTION for Order to Obtain Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 filed by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc..(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/19 7:05 PM
REPLY to Response to1 MOTION for Order to Obtain Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 filed by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc..(Jozwiak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, May 06, 2022
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/06 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Transcript Excerpts by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc.(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Marc Abramowitz Deposition Transcript Excerpts
Thursday, May 05, 2022
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/05 8:59 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to1 MOTION for Order to Obtain Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by Defendant Marc L. Abramowitz.(Jorgensen, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Anke Sessler,
Att: 2 Declaration of Dr. Frank Saliger,
Att: 3 Declaration of Peter Jorgensen,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I
14 14 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 05/05 6:30 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wang Jae Rhee on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc.Attorney Wang Jae Rhee added to party Palantir Technologies Inc.(pty:inre) (Rhee, Wang Jae)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 05/05 6:28 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Olivia P. Greene on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc.Attorney Olivia P. Greene added to party Palantir Technologies Inc.(pty:inre) (Greene, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 05/04 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Jorgensen on behalf of Marc L. AbramowitzAttorney Peter Jorgensen added to party Marc L. Abramowitz(pty:dft) (Jorgensen, Peter)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 05/04 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Marcus McNichols on behalf of Marc L. AbramowitzAttorney John Marcus McNichols added to party Marc L. Abramowitz(pty:dft) (McNichols, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 04/14 8:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on April 13, 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule Concerning Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 (Dkt.8 ) is GRANTED. Respondent Marc L. Ambramowitz shall file any response to Palantir Technologies Inc.'s ("Palantir") Application and Petition for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings ("Petition") (Dkt.1 ) on or before May 5, 2022. Palantir shall file its reply within 14 days following service of the response. It is further ORDERED that a telephonic hearing is SET on May 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall be prepared to argue their respective positions concerning the Petition (Dkt.1 ). The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342 at the scheduled time.(csarr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
order Memorandum Wed 04/13 9:38 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding1 MOTION for Order to filed by Palantir Technologies Inc.,8 Joint MOTION for Leave to Approve Briefing Schedule Concerning Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 filed by Palantir Technologies Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/13/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
8 8 motion Leave Thu 04/07 1:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Approve Briefing Schedule Concerning Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 by In Re Palantir Technologies Inc..(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/06 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Mermann Jozwiak on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc.Attorney Daniel Mermann Jozwiak added to party Palantir Technologies Inc.(pty:inre) (Jozwiak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Association Wed 04/06 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Paul Howard Schwartz, David Y. Livshiz, Robert G.M. Barton on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/06 9:45 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/06 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Y. Livshiz on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/06 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert G.M. Barton on behalf of Palantir Technologies Inc.Attorney Robert G.M. Barton added to party Palantir Technologies Inc.(pty:inre) (norlin, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition/Application Wed 04/06 9:34 AM
PETITION PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES INC.S APPLICATION AND PETITION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 TO OBTAIN DISCOVERY FOR USE IN FOREIGN PROCEEDINGS (Filing fee $ 49, Receipt Number COX102741), filed by Palantir Technologies Inc..(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-01,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-02,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-03,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-04,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-05,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-06,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-07,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-08,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-09,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-10,
Att: 13 Exhibit A-11,
Att: 14 Exhibit A-12,
Att: 15 Exhibit A-13,
Att: 16 Exhibit B,
Att: 17 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 18 Exhibit C,
Att: 19 Exhibit C-1,
Att: 20 Exhibit C-2,
Att: 21 Exhibit C-3,
Att: 22 Exhibit C-4,
Att: 23 Exhibit D
misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 04/06 9:59 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]