Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-01760

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:22-ap-00079
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sanders Armstrong
23180 Marston Road
Laurel Hill, NC 28351
Represented By
Sanders Armstrong
contact info
Defendant
Marvin Morris
1575 Main Street, Lot 21
Bryson City, NC 28713
Represented By
Marvin Morris
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Morris
2838 Lambert Trail
Chesapeake, VA 23323
Represented By
Lisa Morris
contact info
Defendant
Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz
10 Paradise Ridge Road
Candler, NC 28715
Represented By
Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz
contact info
Defendant
Beverly Rodriguez
302 Fernwood Drive
Rutherfordton, NC 28139
Represented By
Beverly Rodriguez
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Downing
6707 NC Highway 902
Pittsboro, NC 27312
Represented By
Thomas Downing
contact info
Defendant
Rochelle Downing
6645 NC Highway 902
Siler City, NC 27344
Represented By
Rochelle Downing
contact info
Defendant
C. Lynne Clapp
2301 John Thompson Road Apartment H
Graham, NC 27253
Represented By
C. Lynne Clapp
contact info
Defendant
Annie R. Hasan
1340 McArthur Road
Fayetteville, NC 28311
Represented By
Annie R. Hasan
contact info
Defendant
Marshall R. Kornegay, Jr.
556 Homestead Lane
Angier, NC 27501
Represented By
Marshall R. Kornegay, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Jeanie Y. Kornegay
PO Box 755
Buies Creek, NC 27506
Represented By
Jeanie Y. Kornegay
contact info
Defendant
Elijah Edwards
2603 Joplin Drive
Nashville, TN 37210
Represented By
Elijah Edwards
contact info
Defendant
Sheilda A. Edwards
2603 Joplin Drive
Nashville, TN 37210
Represented By
Sheilda A. Edwards
contact info
Defendant
The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson
Represented By
The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson
contact info
Plaintiff
North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.
1800 Canal Drive
Carolina Beach, NC 28428
Represented By
David J Haidt
Ayers & Haidt, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/22 3:02 PM
Adversary Case 5:22-ap-79 Closed (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
court Returned Mail (Text) Thu 06/16 3:41 PM
Notification of Returned Mail by BNC addressed to Defendant Marvin Morris. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
15 15 order Default Judgment Tue 06/07 10:09 AM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, June 03, 2022
14 14 court Entry of Default Fri 06/03 12:04 PM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc., Motion for Entry of Default
Thursday, June 02, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 06/03 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/02/2022. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
12 12 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/31 4:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson, Motion for Entry of Default as to The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Affidavit Tue 05/31 4:26 PM
Affidavit of Service of Process by Publication filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Tue 05/31 3:22 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Sanders Armstrong, C. Lynne Clapp, Elijah Edwards, Sheilda A. Edwards, Annie R. Hasan, Lisa Morris, Marvin Morris, Beverly Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, May 23, 2022
court Returned Mail (Text) Mon 05/23 3:35 PM
Notification of Returned Mail by BNC addressed to Defendant Marvin Morris. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Entry of Default
Thursday, May 12, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 05/13 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/12/2022. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
8 8 court Entry of Default Tue 05/10 12:58 PM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.
Monday, May 09, 2022
misc Address Change - Creditor/Party (Text) Mon 05/09 9:46 AM
Notification of Address Change ( Both Notices and Payments ) for Thomas Downing. Existing address is 6707 NC Highway 902, Pittsboro, NC 27312. New address is 6645 NC Highway 902, Siler City, NC 27344 filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
misc Address Change - Creditor/Party (Text) Mon 05/09 9:48 AM
Notification of Address Change ( Both Notices and Payments ) for Marshall Kornegay, Jr.. Existing address is 556 Homestead Lane, Angier, NC 27501. New address is PO Box 755, Buies Creek, NC 27506 filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
utility Address Modified Mon 05/09 10:39 AM
Address(es) Modified. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
7 7 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/06 3:54 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Sanders Armstrong, C. Lynne Clapp, Elijah Edwards, Sheilda A. Edwards, Annie R. Hasan, Lisa Morris, Marvin Morris, Beverly Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz, Motion for Entry of Default as to Sanders Armstrong, C. Lynne Clapp, Elijah Edwards, Sheilda A. Edwards, Annie R. Hasan, Lisa Morris, Marvin Morris, Beverly Rodriguez, Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/06 3:47 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Rochelle Downing, Thomas Downing, Jeanie Y. Kornegay, Marshall R. Kornegay Jr. filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/25 9:18 AM
Summons Service Executed on The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson 4/17/2022. filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
4 4 court Summons Reissued Tue 04/19 12:16 PM
Summons Reissued on The Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson Date Issued 4/19/2022, Answer Due 5/19/2022 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/06 3:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sanders Armstrong 4/6/2022; C. Lynne Clapp 4/6/2022; Rochelle Downing 4/6/2022; Thomas Downing 4/6/2022; Elijah Edwards 4/6/2022; Sheilda A. Edwards 4/6/2022; Annie R. Hasan 4/6/2022; Jeanie Y. Kornegay 4/6/2022; Marshall R. Kornegay Jr. 4/6/2022; Lisa Morris 4/6/2022; Marvin Morris 4/6/2022; Beverly Rodriguez 4/6/2022; Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz 4/6/2022. filed by David J Haidt on behalf of North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/05 4:37 PM
Summons Issued on Sanders Armstrong Answer Due 05/5/2022; Marvin Morris Answer Due 05/5/2022; Lisa Morris Answer Due 05/5/2022; Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz Answer Due 05/5/2022; Beverly Rodriguez Answer Due 05/5/2022; Thomas Downing Answer Due 05/5/2022; Rochelle Downing Answer Due 05/5/2022; C. Lynne Clapp Answer Due 05/5/2022; Annie R. Hasan Answer Due 05/5/2022; Marshall Kornegay Jr. Answer Due 05/5/2022; Jeanie Y. Kornegay Answer Due 05/5/2022; Elijah Edwards Answer Due 05/5/2022; Sheilda A. Edwards Answer Due 05/5/2022; The remaining Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson Answer Due 05/5/2022 (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/05 4:37 PM
Adversary case 22-00079 5. Complaint by North Pier Ocean Villas Homeowners Association, Inc. against Sanders Armstrong, Marvin Morris, Lisa Morris, Roberto Rodriguez-Cruz, Beverly Rodriguez, Thomas Downing, Rochelle Downing, C. Lynne Clapp, Annie R. Hasan, Marshall Kornegay Jr., Jeanie Y. Kornegay, Elijah Edwards, Sheilda A. Edwards, The remaining Unknown Heirs of Fern Greeson (Fee Paid) (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Haidt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent orders