Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-50153

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert L Jones
Case #: 5:22-ap-05004
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Jun 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quball Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Quball Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
WTX WO, LTD
Represented By
WTX WO, LTD
contact info
Defendant
Joshua L. Allen
Represented By
Joshua L. Allen
contact info
Defendant
Johnny Qubty
Represented By
Johnny Qubty
contact info
Plaintiff
Chance Wade Britt
16002 CR 1830
Lubbock, TX 79424
Represented By
Joseph Edwin Price
J. Edwin Price, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexa Lynn Britt
16002 CR 1830
Lubbock, TX 79424
Represented By
Joseph Edwin Price
J. Edwin Price, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Raiderland Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Edwin Price
J. Edwin Price, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
court Close adversary case Wed 06/29 11:43 AM
Adversary case 5:22-ap-5004 closed (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
24 24 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 06/16 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding without prejudice (related document22 ) Entered on 6/14/2022. (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
23 23 order Dismiss adversary proceeding Tue 06/14 4:34 PM
Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding without prejudice Related [+] Entered on 6/14/2022. (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, May 30, 2022
22 22 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Mon 05/30 9:59 AM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiffs Alexa Lynn Britt, Chance Wade Britt, Raiderland Holdings, LLC (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
21 21 court Hearing held Thu 05/26 4:23 PM
Hearing held on 5/25/2022. MOTION TO DISMISS TO BE FILED Related [+] (Longoria, S)
Related: [-] 9 Jury demand filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint).,10 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $188, filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD
Monday, May 23, 2022
20 20 answer Reply Mon 05/23 8:13 PM
Reply to Related [+] filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD. (Johnston, Todd)
Related: [-] 17 Objection filed by Plaintiff Chance Wade Britt, Plaintiff Alexa Lynn Britt, Plaintiff Raiderland Holdings, LLC
19 19 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 05/23 2:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Fernando M. Bustos filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD. (Bustos, Fernando)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
18 18 motion Strike document Tue 05/17 11:36 AM
Motion to strike Related [+] filed by Plaintiffs Alexa Lynn Britt , Chance Wade Britt , Raiderland Holdings, LLC (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 9 Jury demand filed by Defendant Johnny Qubty, Defendant Quball Holdings, LLC, Defendant WTX WO, LTD, Defendant Joshua L. Allen
17 17 answer Objection Mon 05/16 4:05 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Plaintiffs Alexa Lynn Britt, Chance Wade Britt, Raiderland Holdings, LLC. (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $188, filed by Defendant Johnny Qubty, Defendant Quball Holdings, LLC, Defendant WTX WO, LTD, Defendant Joshua L. Allen
16 16 cmp Amended complaint Mon 05/16 3:58 PM
Amended complaint by Joseph Edwin Price on behalf of Alexa Lynn Britt, Chance Wade Britt, Raiderland Holdings, LLC against Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD No change to nature of suit. Related [+]. (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-05004 Complaint by Chance Wade Britt, Alexa Lynn Britt, Raiderland Holdings, LLC against Quball Holdings, LLC, WTX WO, LTD, Joshua L. Allen, Johnny Qubty. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). filed by Plaintiff Chance Wade Britt, Plaintiff Alexa Lynn Britt, Plaintiff Raiderland Holdings, LLC
Saturday, April 30, 2022
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 04/30 11:15 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # 5:22-cv-82 (RE: related document(s)10 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fe .) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/30/2022. (Admin.
Thursday, April 28, 2022
14 14 court Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference Thu 04/28 4:16 PM
Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # 5:22-cv-82 Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fe (Longoria, S)
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Tue 04/26 10:08 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/25/2022 at 01:30 PM Lubbock Judge Jones Ctrm for9 , (Johnston, Todd)
Related: [-] 9 Jury demand filed by Defendant Johnny Qubty, Defendant Quball Holdings, LLC, Defendant WTX WO, LTD, Defendant Joshua L. Allen
11 11 notice Notice (generic) Tue 04/26 9:56 AM
Notice of Status Conference filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD Related [+]. (Johnston, Todd)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant Johnny Qubty, Defendant Quball Holdings, LLC, Defendant WTX WO, LTD, Defendant Joshua L. Allen
Monday, April 25, 2022
10 10 motion Withdrawal of reference Mon 04/25 8:14 PM
Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $188, filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD (Johnston, Todd)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Jury demand Mon 04/25 8:11 PM
Jury demand filed by Defendants Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD Related [+]. (Johnston, Todd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 answer Answer to complaint Mon 04/25 8:10 PM
Answer to complaint with Jury Demand filed by Joshua L. Allen, Quball Holdings, LLC, Johnny Qubty, WTX WO, LTD. (Johnston, Todd)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/25 8:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for withdrawal of reference([LINK 22-05004 rlj] ) [motion,mwdref] ( 188.00). Receipt number A29490768, amount $ 188.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
Thursday, April 07, 2022
7 7 cmp Summons service executed Thu 04/07 4:51 PM
Summons service executed on Quball Holdings, LLC 4/7/2022 (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Thu 04/07 4:50 PM
Summons service executed on WTX WO, LTD 4/7/2022 (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons service executed Thu 04/07 4:49 PM
Summons service executed on Joshua L. Allen 4/7/2022 (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Thu 04/07 4:47 PM
Summons service executed on Johnny Qubty 4/7/2022 (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 04/07 10:36 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 8/17/2022 at 01:30 PM Lubbock Judge Jones Ctrm. Entered on 4/7/2022 (Graham, C.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chance Wade Britt, Plaintiff Alexa Lynn Britt, Plaintiff Raiderland Holdings, LLC
2 2 court Summons issued Thu 04/07 10:30 AM
Summons issued on Joshua L. Allen Answer Due 5/9/2022; Quball Holdings, LLC Answer Due 5/9/2022; Johnny Qubty Answer Due 5/9/2022; WTX WO, LTD Answer Due 5/9/2022 (Graham, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/05 4:27 PM
Adversary case 22-05004 Complaint by Chance Wade Britt, Alexa Lynn Britt, Raiderland Holdings, LLC against Quball Holdings, LLC, WTX WO, LTD, Joshua L. Allen, Johnny Qubty. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 11 Related [+]. 14. (Price, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of propertycovery of money/property - other