Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:22-cv-01339
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Apr 19, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Chris Cho
Represented By
Benson Edward Pope
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Hyojoung Cho
Represented By
Benson Edward Pope
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Gold Mine Beverage, LLC
Represented By
Benson Edward Pope
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyung Bo Kim
Represented By
Brian G. Kim
Brian Kim, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Young Sun Kim
Represented By
Brian G. Kim
Brian Kim, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 09/06 2:52 PM
ORDER approving12 Motion for Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/06/2022. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
12 12 motion For Settlement Fri 09/02 3:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (to Approve) by Chris Cho, Hyojoung Cho, Gold Mine Beverage, LLC.(Pope, Benson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/02 3:31 PM
NOTICE Of Filing of Settlement Agreement by Chris Cho, Hyojoung Cho, Gold Mine Beverage, LLC(Pope, Benson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
10 10 minutes Status Conference Thu 06/16 9:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: Status Conference held on 6/15/2022. The parties conferred with the court to advise that a settlement had been reached in this civil action. Parties came to an agreement resolving the issues and the hearing was concluded thereafter. Details of the agreement available via ZOOM with leave of court. (Tape #Zoom Icloud)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
9 9 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 06/08 8:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: Settlement Conference held on 6/7/2022. Parties appeared before the court for a mediation but were unsuccessful at resolving their issues. However, the parties did agree to a mediators proposal. The court will hold the case for 8 days to see if the parties can work through their issues. (Tape #Zoom Icloud)(jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 06/15 12:59 PM
Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
8 8 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Tue 04/19 10:29 AM
ORDER setting Settlement Conference. Case referred to Judge Walker for mediation. Settlement Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1860 before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/19/2022. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/19 10:26 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 06/15 12:58 PM
Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker added. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/18 5:42 PM
ORDER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. This closure is not a dismissal and does not preclude the filing of documents. The case may be re-opened if necessary. The parties are ORDERED to notify the Court about the outcome of mediation within five (5) business days of mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 18, 2022. (ash)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Arbitration Mon 04/18 5:36 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Referral to Magistrate Judge for Mediation and to Stay Deadlines. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Chief Magistrate Judge for a mediation assignment. All deadlines in this case are stayed pending the outcome of mediation. The Parties shall notify the Court about the outcome of mediation within five (5) days of mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 18, 2022. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
5 5 motion Arbitration Thu 04/14 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Arbitration Related [+] by Chris Cho, Hyojoung Cho, Gold Mine Beverage, LLC.(Pope, Benson)
Related: [-] ferral to Magistrate Judge for Mediation and to Stay Deadlines Pending Outcome of Mediation
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/13 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benson Edward Pope on behalf of Chris Cho, Hyojoung Cho, Gold Mine Beverage, LLC (Pope, Benson)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/11 5:29 PM
NOTICE by Kyung Bo Kim, Young Sun Kim Civil Cover Sheet (Kim, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Thu 04/07 8:46 AM
STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 7, 2022. (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/06 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kyung Bo Kim and Young Sun Kim. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11711539) (eop)
Related: [-]