Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Chad W Bryan
Case #: 2:22-cv-00161
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Nov 09, 2022
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, 03-CV-22-900031.00
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 4:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Wilton D. Smith, Jr.
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Reardon
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Michael Carlton Niemeyer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Defendant
Linetec Services, LLC
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Reardon
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Michael Carlton Niemeyer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamie D. Murphy
Represented By
Alyssa Noles Daniels
Shunnarah Injury Attorneys
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC
Terminated: 05/31/2022
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Reardon
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Michael Carlton Niemeyer
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/09 10:52 AM
ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice and with costs taxed as paid; DIRECTING the Clerk to close the file; Any party may file a motion to re-open within 20 days. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 11/9/2022. (Furnished: Calendar & CS) (Terminated: PTC for 5/19/2023 & Jury Trial for 7/24/2023) (amf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/04 11:25 AM
NOTICE Joint Notice of Settlement by Linetec Services, LLC, Wilton D. Smith, Jr., Jamie D. Murphy Related [+] Modified on 11/4/2022 to add as also filed on behalf of the Plaintiff (amf, )
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
notice Notice of Settlement Fri 11/04 11:52 AM
Joint NOTICE of Settlement by Linetec Services, LLC, Jamie D. Murphy, Wilton D. Smith, Jr.. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc17 for PDF) (amf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/20 5:17 PM
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/24/2023, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2023, at 11:00 AM CST, in Courtroom 5B, before Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/19/2023; Mediation Notice due by 1/24/2023; Amended Pleadings by Plf due by 7/29/2022 and by Dfts due by 8/29/2022; Discovery due by 12/20/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 7/20/2022. (furn: calendar, cs) (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
15 15 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/15 10:29 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Amendment to Complaint Tue 06/14 8:59 PM
ANSWER to Amendment to Complaint by Wilton D. Smith, Jr Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
13 13 answer Answer to Amendment to Complaint Tue 06/14 8:57 PM
ANSWER to Amendment to Complaint by Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC, Linetec Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
Friday, June 10, 2022
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 06/10 4:30 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Linetec Services, LLC, Wilton D. Smith, Jr.. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 06/10 4:28 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jamie D. Murphy. (wcl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Correction Tue 05/31 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Correction re8 Order, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the proper case style on the pleading to include "et al".(amf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main PDF to Document
Att: 8
8 8 5 pgs order Order Tue 05/31 12:14 PM
ORDER: DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 6/14/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/31/2022. (amf, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/31/2022 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the proper case style on the pleading to include "et al") (amf, ). Modified on 5/31/2022 (amf, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 05/31 2:36 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Properly Amend the Name of Defendant Linetec Services, LLC. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/31/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
7 7 motion Leave to File Document Wed 05/11 9:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Properly Amend the Name of Defendant by Jamie D. Murphy. (Daniels, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint, Amendment Tue 05/31 3:39 PM
AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT filed by Jamie D. Murphy. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc 7 for PDF)(amf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
6 6 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 05/04 3:34 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 07, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/07 2:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/07 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC, Jamie D. Murphy, & Wilton D. Smith, Jr. (am, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Thu 04/07 1:58 PM
Conflict Disclosure Statement by Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC. (am, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Thu 04/07 1:58 PM
Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wilton D. Smith, Jr. (am, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2022-900031.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602066458)(am, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Defendant Smith Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-State Court Record,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C-Smith Consent,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Receipt
cmp Complaint Thu 04/07 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC, Wilton D. Smith, Jr., filed by Jamie D. Murphy. (NO PDF - See doc 1 )(am, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 04/07 1:57 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jamie D. Murphy. (NO PDF - See doc1 ) (am, )
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/07 1:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Wilton D. Smith, Jr. (NO PDF - See doc 1 )(am, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Filing Removal to State Court by Linetec Services Power Holding, LLC. (NO PDF - See doc1 ) (am, )
Related: [-]
misc Joinder Thu 04/07 1:58 PM
CONSENT to1 Removal by Wilton D. Smith, Jr. (NO PDF - SEE doc1 ) (am, )
Related: [-]