Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Kearney
Case #: 2:22-cv-01365
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2022
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 04, 2022 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By
NICOLE S. MORRIS
City Of Philadelphia Solicitor'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMYRA FOREMAN
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.
Murphy Law Group LLC
contact info
Andrew Jordan Schreiber
Murphy Law Group, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE
Terminated: 06/13/2022
Represented By
NICOLE S. MORRIS
City Of Philadelphia Solicitor'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 08/23 11:10 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/23/22. 8/23/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
12 12 misc Report Of Mon 08/22 9:44 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by TAMYRA FOREMAN. (Schreiber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 08/16 10:01 AM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE WILL BE HELD ON 8/23/22 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/16/22. 8/16/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
10 10 misc Letter Mon 08/15 11:58 AM
Letter dated August 15, 2022 by TAMYRA FOREMAN. (Schreiber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/09 9:08 AM
ORDER THAT AM INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (VIA TELEPHONE) IS SET FOR 8/24/22 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/9/22. 8/9/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/08 8:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.(MORRIS, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/13 3:55 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' STIPULATION5 IS APPROVED. THE CAPTION IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE AMENDED AS ABOVE TO REFLECT THE CORRECT DEFENDANT AS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. ALL PARTIES SHALL USE, AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL AMEND, THE CAPTION AS ABOVE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/13/22. 6/13/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/13 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAMYRA FOREMAN. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE waiver sent on 6/7/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 06/13 11:48 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney) change the name of the defendant by THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE. (MORRIS, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/23 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAMYRA FOREMAN re: Melissa Petrowski served Summons and Complaint upon THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE by Summons in a Civil Action. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/07 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE. E-mailed to Andrew Jordan Schreiber on 4/7/22. (fdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/07 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of TAMYRA FOREMAN with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 04/07 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15842497.), filed by TAMYRA FOREMAN.(Schreiber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form