Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:22-cv-00794
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2022
Re-opened:May 06, 2024
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 04, 2022 4:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Chance Smith
Represented By
Brent Thomas Buyse
Gordon & Rees Llp - Dallas
contact info
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Jon Pearson
Represented By
Brent Thomas Buyse
Gordon & Rees Llp - Dallas
contact info
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Optimum Energy Partners LLC
Represented By
Brent Thomas Buyse
Gordon & Rees Llp - Dallas
contact info
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Derrick May
Represented By
Brent Thomas Buyse
Gordon & Rees Llp - Dallas
contact info
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Hibbs
Represented By
Brent Thomas Buyse
Gordon & Rees Llp - Dallas
contact info
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Glen M Ashworth
Honorable Glen M Ashworth
contact info
Plaintiff
Legacy Exploration LLC
Represented By
Jon-Bernard Schwartz
Jb Schwartz PLLC
contact info
Elizabeth Mitchell Branning
Jb Schwartz PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Christopher Fusco
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Swarm Resources LLC
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Thomas E McElyea
Mcelyea Law
contact info
Tim Robinson
Payne Robinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Shelton
Terminated: 07/20/2022
Represented By
Robert G Chadwick, Jr
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ebby Morris
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Eugene McAdams
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
David J May
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Alexa May
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Kirstie Morgan Simmerman
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Leo Lembo
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Thomas E McElyea
Mcelyea Law
contact info
Tim Robinson
Payne Robinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Griffin
Terminated: 07/20/2022
Represented By
Robert G Chadwick, Jr
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Giordano
Terminated: 07/18/2022
Represented By
Thomas E McElyea
Mcelyea Law
contact info
Tim Robinson
Payne Robinson LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 08 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 70 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/8/2024) (cfk)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
183 183 misc Transcript Tue 03/18 10:54 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on 6/11/2024 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Thu "Tutti" Bui, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their[LINK:duty to review] the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. § 3509, file a[LINK:Redaction Request - Transcript] within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (9 pages) Redaction Request due 4/8/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2025. (tub)
Related: [-]