South Dakota District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-40034
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Last checked: Friday Apr 08, 2022 3:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Elliott Anderson (1)
Represented By
Amanda D. Kippley
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Clapper
U.S. Attorney'S Office (sioux Falls, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2022 4:12 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
Attorney update in case as to Elliott Anderson. Attorney Amanda D. Kippley for Elliott Anderson added. (PM) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Elliott Anderson: Initial Appearance set for 3/9/2022 at 04:00 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 3 - Room 117 before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy.. (PM) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Elliott Anderson (1). NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Complaint,
Att: 2 Sealed Charging Document
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Elliott Anderson. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Elliott Anderson (1). This case to be unsealed on March 10, 2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/9/22. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
5 5 Final BAIL Report as to Elliott Anderson. USPO shall manually deliver a copy of this document to the attorneys for the appropriate parties. (Novak, Carol) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy: Initial Appearance as to Elliott Anderson held on 3/9/2022., Arraignment as to Elliott Anderson (1) Count Complaint held on 3/9/2022 Plea Entered: Not Guilty, Detention Hearing as to Elliott Anderson held on 3/9/2022. (Court Reporter: FTR #3) (JLS) TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence--that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. (Emailed to FPD and AUSA) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit signed by Elliott Anderson. (JLS) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
8 8 TEXT ORDER Appointing Federal Public Defender as to Elliott Anderson (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/9/2022. (Emailed to AUSA and FPD) (JLS) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination signed by Elliott Anderson. (JLS) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Elliott Anderson. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/9/2022. (Emailed to FPD and AUSA) (JLS) Emailed USMS on 3/10/2022 (DJP). [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda D. Kippley appearing for Elliott Anderson. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
12 12 REQUEST for Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 404(b) by Elliott Anderson. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
13 13 REQUEST for Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 609(b) by Elliott Anderson. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
Case unsealed as to Elliott Anderson. (DJP) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
14 14 Warrant Returned Executed on 3/8/22 in case as to Elliott Anderson. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
15 15 Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order as to Elliott Anderson. (Clapper, Jeffrey) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
16 16 TEXT ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Upon the foregoing Stipulation15 and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that any discovery materials, including but not limited to statements and summaries of interviews of witnesses furnished by the prosecution to the defense, shall not be used by the Defendant or the attorney for the Defendant for any purpose other than in direct relationship to this case. Without permission of the Court, defense counsel shall not photocopy the materials or provide them to any third party, except to make copies for use of the defense counsel in this case, an investigator, or expert witness. No further dissemination of discovery material shall be made, and under no circumstances shall such material be available to any employee of any attorney who was previously convicted of a felony but not restored to his or her civil rights. Any and all copies of discovery materials shall be returned to defense counsel at the completion of the case so that they can be destroyed by defense counsel. Defense counsel shall otherwise keep the items furnished in the possession of defense counsel, and the materials shall not be given to the Defendant or anyone else without the permission of the Court. Defense counsel may allow the Defendant to read the discovery materials, but only in the presence of defense counsel, the defense investigator, or a defense expert. It is further ORDERED that all discovery materials not previously destroyed shall be returned to attorneys for the United States of America immediately upon final disposition of the case. This text order entered as to Elliott Anderson (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/11/2022. (KK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
17 17 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as to Elliott Anderson. Motions due by 3/30/2022. Plea Agreement due by 4/19/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2022 at 9:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/15/22. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
18 18 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance pursuant to 18:3161 by Elliott Anderson. (Kippley, Amanda) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
19 19 Informed CONSENT to Continuance signed by Elliott Anderson. (Kippley, Amanda) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
20 20 ORDER granting18 Motion for Continuance pursuant to 18:3161 as to Elliott Anderson (1). Motions due by 5/18/2022. Plea Agreement due by 6/6/2022. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2022 at 9:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/1/22. (SKK) [4:22-mj-00056-LLP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
21 21 INDICTMENT (personal identifiers redacted) as to Elliott Anderson (1) count(s) 1. NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (DLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Charging Document