Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Case #: 3:22-cv-00251
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2022
Terminated:May 24, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 05, 2022 3:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Plaintiff
Montel Gest
1501 Woodland Pointe Drive Apartment #1405
Nashville, TN 37214
Represented By
Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Monday, June 06, 2022
13 13 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/06 11:27 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward.9 Order Dismissing Case. Mail sent to Montel Gest. (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 06/01 11:45 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle Frederick Biesecker admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/31 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Montel Gest (Biesecker, Kyle)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Tue 05/31 11:05 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, the Motion (Doc. No.10 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to pay the mandatory filing fee. Gest may, either pro se or through retained counsel, may initiate a new civil action subject to all applicable rules and time limits. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/31/2022.(xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
10 10 motion Reopen Case Fri 05/27 10:38 AM
MOTION for Reinstate this Case by Montel Gest. (Apartment number added to address on docket sheet per signature block on this document.) (kc) Modified on 5/27/2022 (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/24 10:11 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Complaint is subject to dismissal because Gest has failed to keep "the Court and opposing parties apprised of [his] current address and other contact information." Furthermore, Gest has not timely paid the required filing fee. For these reasons, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/23/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
8 8 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/05 9:36 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. Unable to Forward. Not Deliverable as Addressed.6 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Montel Gest. (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
7 7 misc Mail Returned Wed 04/20 12:27 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward.3 Notice of Admin Order 217,4 Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement and5 Notice/Information regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. Mail sent to Montel Gest. (kc)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/19 12:48 PM
ORDER: The Application to Proceed Informa Pauperis2 is DENIED. To continue this action, Gest MUST submit the full $402.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court within 30 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket. Failure to comply or request an extension by the deadline will result in dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/19/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 04/08 1:21 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 04/08 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 04/08 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/08 1:18 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Montel Gest. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/08 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services LLC, filed by Montel Gest.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 04/08 2:37 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
Related: [-]