Sungard Availability Services Holdings, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:22-bk-90018
Lead case is: 4:22-bk-90018
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:22-bk-90026 |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Sungard Availability Services Holdings, LLC
565 E Swedesford Rd Ste 320
Wayne, PA 19087-1626 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 02/02 3:45 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (VrianaPortillo) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/14 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) |
|
court
Notice of Duplicate Case Filing
Thu 04/14 2:23 PM
Previous case filed in the Southern District of New York, Case Number 19-22916 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/13 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Tue 04/12 12:17 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Tue 04/12 6:00 AM
|
||
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
order
Joint Administration
Mon 04/11 2:22 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 22-90018 Signed on 4/11/2022 (aalo) |
|
1 | 1
35
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 04/11 9:40 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Sungard Availability Services Holdings, LLC. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 04/11 9:59 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-90026 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23642662. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Mon 04/11 2:23 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 22-90018 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aalo) |