South Carolina District Court
Judge:Jacquelyn D Austin
Case #: 7:22-cv-01164
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2022
Case in other court:Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, 2022-CP-42-00757
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 05, 2022 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Sauer Brands Inc
Represented By
Jefferson Boone Aiken, IV
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd
contact info
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Tina Craig
Represented By
Paul L Reeves
contact info
Todd Richard Lyle
Reeves And Lyle
contact info
Plaintiff
William M Craig, III
Represented By
Paul L Reeves
contact info
Todd Richard Lyle
Reeves And Lyle
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
EcoLab, Inc.
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Sauer Brands Inc
Represented By
Jefferson Boone Aiken, IV
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd
contact info
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chad Clardy
Terminated: 06/30/2022
Represented By
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA
contact info
Defendant
Winston Parks
Terminated: 06/30/2022
Represented By
Roopal S Ruparelia
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
89 89 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 03/25 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Roopal S Ruparelia for 06/18/2025 through 07/06/2025 (Ruparelia, Roopal)
Related: [-]