Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:22-cv-01424
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2022
Terminated:Aug 19, 2022
Case in other court:THIRD CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS, 22-02742
Last checked: Saturday Oct 08, 2022 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC
Represented By
ROBERT MAHONEY
Norris Mclaughlin & Marcus
contact info
REBECCA J. PRICE
Norris, Mclaughlin & Marcus, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45
Represented By
QUINTES D. TAGLIOLI
Markowitz & Richman
contact info
Plaintiff
GLEN WILKOFSKY
Represented By
DANIELLE RUTH ACKER SUSANJ
The Fairness Center
contact info
NATHAN JOHN MCGRATH
The Fairness Center
contact info
Tessa Elizabeth Shurr
The Fairness Center
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2022
OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/29/22. 6/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
GPO Jun 29 2022
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS, ECF NOS. 6 AND 11, ARE GRANTED; PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND PLAINTIFF HAS 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IF HE WISHES TO RE-PLEAD HIS DISMISSED CLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/29/22. 6/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
33 33 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 08/09 1:25 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to29 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment).ORDERED andADJUDGED by this Court that the Order of the District Court entered on August 22, 2022, is hereby AFFIRMED. Costs shall not be taxed in this matter.All of the above in accordance with the Opinion of this Court.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA OPINION
Monday, October 03, 2022
32 32 misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/03 3:22 PM
Certificate of Good Standing requested by Rebecca J. Price - Bar ID 206182 - originally admitted 2008 - contact information: rprice@norris-law.com - receipt number APAEDC-16216704. (PRICE, REBECCA) ***(FILED IN ERROR; TRANSFERRED TO CASE 22-gs-00001)*** Modified on 10/4/2022 (nd).
Related: [-]
31 31 appeal TPO Form Mon 10/03 8:59 AM
TPO Form re29 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), : (SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
30 30 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Mon 09/19 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re29 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by GLEN WILKOFSKY. USCA Case Number 22-2742 (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
29 29 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment) Fri 09/16 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to19 Memorandum and/or Opinion,28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by GLEN WILKOFSKY. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number APAEDC-16181231. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/22 7:23 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ECF NOS. 22 AND 24, ARE GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THIS CASE IS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/19/22.8/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/16 6:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM reply brief w/ cerificate of service filed by ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC. (PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/15 3:40 PM
reply brief w/ cerificate of service filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45.Brief and Certificate of Service.(TAGLIOLI, QUINTES) Modified on 8/16/2022 (lisad, ).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
25 25 25 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/09 11:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,22 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brief in Support filed by GLEN WILKOFSKY.(SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/27 4:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC.Brief, Certificate of Service.(PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
23 23 23 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 07/26 1:23 PM
Brief in Support re22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brief in Support filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45.Brief and Certificate of Service.(TAGLIOLI, QUINTES) Modified on 7/27/2022 (lisad, ).
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 07/26 1:19 PM
Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brief in Support filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45.Certificate of Counsel and Service.(TAGLIOLI, QUINTES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
21 21 14 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/13 7:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45, filed by GLEN WILKOFSKY.(MCGRATH, NATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 06/29 4:20 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS, ECF NOS.6 AND11 , ARE GRANTED; PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND PLAINTIFF HAS 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IF HE WISHES TO RE-PLEAD HIS DISMISSED CLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/29/22. 6/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
19 19 14 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 06/29 4:16 PM
OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/29/22. 6/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 05/27 1:58 PM
RESPONSE in Support re11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (In Further Support) filed by ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC.(PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/27 10:15 AM
Reply Brief in Support re MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45.Response Brief & Certificate of Service.(TAGLIOLI, QUINTES) Modified on 5/31/2022 (lisad, ).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 05/25 12:11 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT MAHONEY, ESQ. TO PRATICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/25/22. 5/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
15 15 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 05/24 12:34 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Mahoney by ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15940425.).(PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 20, 2022
14 14 17 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/20 11:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GLEN WILKOFSKY.(SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/11 3:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by The Browning Group LLC re: served Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Order, Appearances upon Allentown Symphony Association Inc by hand delivery on 4/18/22 (SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/11 3:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by The Browning Group LLC re: served Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Order, Appearances upon American Federation of Musicians, Local 45 by hand delivery on 4/18/22 (SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/09 5:13 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC.Brief, Certificate of Service.(PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT G,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 06, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/06 3:19 PM
ORDER THAT 1. THE STIPULATION, ECF 9, IS APPROVED AND GRANTED IN PART AND DISAPPROVED AND DENIED IN PART; AND 2. DEFENDANT, ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION, INC.'S DEADLINE TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ONLY, AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE, IS EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING MAY 23, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/6/22. 5/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 05/06 2:58 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Allentown Symphony Association's Time to File a Responsive Pleading by ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC.(PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/06 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA J. PRICE on behalf of ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC with Certificate of Service(PRICE, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 19 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/06 2:26 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brief in Support filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45.Brief and Certificate of Service.(TAGLIOLI, QUINTES)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/06 2:23 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45.Certificate of Counsel and Service.(TAGLIOLI, QUINTES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/13 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tessa Elizabeth Shurr on behalf of GLEN WILKOFSKY with Certificate of Service(Shurr, Tessa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/13 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE RUTH ACKER SUSANJ on behalf of GLEN WILKOFSKY with Certificate of Service(SUSANJ, DANIELLE)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/13 11:04 AM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/13/22. 4/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/12 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/11/22 (er)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 04/11 7:29 PM
COMPLAINT against ALLENTOWN SYMPHONY ASSOCIATION INC, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF MUSICIANS, LOCAL 45 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15850203.), filed by GLEN WILKOFSKY.(MCGRATH, NATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A