California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:22-cv-02383
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 05, 2022 2:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Frontier Airlines
Represented By
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Brian T. Maye
Adler Murphy And Mcquillen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Southwest Airlines
Represented By
M. Roy Goldberg
Stinson LLP
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
Stat-MD
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Wetzel
Dickie Mccamey And Chilcote PC
contact info
Steven L. Ettinger
Dickie Mccamey And Chilcote PC
contact info
John C Conti
Dickie Mccamey And Chilcote PC
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
MedAire
Represented By
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Barry S. Alexander
Schnader Harrison Segal And Lewis LLP
contact info
Brittany C. Wakim
Schnader Harrison Segal And Lewis LLP
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
Transportation Security Administration
Represented By
Michael J. Gerardi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Andrew Freidah
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Johnny Hillary Walker
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen M Pezzi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United Airlines
Represented By
M. Roy Goldberg
Stinson LLP
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
Hawaiian Airlines
Represented By
M. Roy Goldberg
Stinson LLP
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
Yet-To-Be-Named Employees of the 8 Airlines
Defendant
Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By
Michael J. Gerardi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Andrew Freidah
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Johnny Hillary Walker
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen M Pezzi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Delta Air Lines
Represented By
M. Roy Goldberg
Stinson LLP
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By
Michael J. Gerardi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Andrew Freidah
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Johnny Hillary Walker
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Stephen M Pezzi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Julie Carrigan
Represented By
Michael J. Gerardi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Andrew Freidah
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Johnny Hillary Walker
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Jeremy S Brumbelow
Doj-Civ
contact info
Stephen M Pezzi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
American Airlines
Represented By
M. Roy Goldberg
Stinson LLP
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Defendant
Allegiant Air
Represented By
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Brian T. Maye
Adler Murphy And Mcquillen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alaska Airlines
Represented By
M. Roy Goldberg
Stinson LLP
contact info
Michael Cutler
Victor Rane
contact info
Richard A. Lazenby
Victor Rane
contact info
Plaintiff
Cindy Russo
22485 Breakwater Way
Santa Clarita, CA 91350
Plaintiff
Yvonne Marcus
P O Box 126
Ojai, CA 93024
Plaintiff
Uri Marcus
P O Box 126
Ojai, CA 93024
Plaintiff
Devorah Gordon
2251 State Route 222
New Richmond, OH 45157
Plaintiff
Avrohom Gordon
2251 State Route 222
New Richmond, OH 45157


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
263 263 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 11/04 5:01 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, in favor of Stat-MD against Avrohom Gordon, Cindy Russo, Devorah Gordon, Uri Marcus, Yvonne Marcus: The Court, having GRANTED Defendant STAT MDs motion to dismiss on June 12, 2024 (DKT. 241), IT IS NOW, THEREFORE, HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment is entered in this action as follows: 1. Plaintiffs shall recover nothing from STAT MD; 2. STAT MD shall have judgment in its favor on Plaintiffs' entire action, which is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 3. STAT MD shall recover from Plaintiffs their "prevailing party costs" in the sum that shall be determined. (bm)
Related: [-]
262 262 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 11/04 4:58 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, in favor of MedAire against Avrohom Gordon, Cindy Russo, Devorah Gordon, Uri Marcus, Yvonne Marcus: The Court, having GRANTED Defendant MedAire, Inc.'s ("MedAire") motion to dismiss on June 12, 2024 (DKT. 240), IT IS NOW, THEREFORE, HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment is entered in this action as follows: 1. Plaintiffs were ordered to file an amended complaint no later than June 29, 2024; 2. To date, plaintiffs have not filed an amended complaint; 3. Plaintiffs shall recover nothing from MedAire; 4. MedAire shall have judgment in its favor on Plaintiffs' entire action, which is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 5. MedAire shall recover from Plaintiffs its "prevailing party costs" in the sum that shall be determined. (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
261 261 judgmentCV Judgment Wed 10/30 3:48 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, Related to: Order on Motion to Dismiss,243 IT IS NOW, THEREFORE, HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment is entered in this action as follows: 1. Plaintiffs were ordered to file an amended complaint no later than June 29, 2024; 2. To date, plaintiffs have not filed an amended complaint; 3. Plaintiffs shall recover nothing from Airline Defendants; 4. Airline Defendants shall have judgment in their favor on Plaintiffs' entire action, which is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 5. Airline Defendants shall recover from Plaintiffs their "prevailing party costs" in the sum that shall be determined. (es)
Related: [-]
260 260 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/30 3:37 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT JULIE CARRIGAN WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY JULY 19, 2024 [DKT.254 ] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Accordingly, Defendant Julie Carrigan is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. As a result, this case is hereby CLOSED as all remaining Defendants have been dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. [See document for further information.] (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es)
Related: [-]
259 259 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 10/30 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed (STAT-MD's Proposed Judgment) re Order on Motion to Dismiss241(Cutler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Judgment,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
258 258 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 10/30 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed (MedAire's Proposed Judgment) re Order on Motion to Dismiss240(Cutler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Judgment,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Monday, October 28, 2024
257 257 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 10/28 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss,243(Cutler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Judgment,
Att: 2 Proof of Service