Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:22-cv-01943
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2022
Terminated:Nov 16, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 09, 2022 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Omega Matrice Morris
Defendant
PPLG LLC
Defendant
TSM LLC
Plaintiff
Ronald Fuller
Represented By
Geoffrey C. Parker
Hilton Parker LLC
contact info
Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Hilton Parker LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/16 8:06 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/15 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ronald Fuller (Hilton, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/12 1:08 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written REPORT detailing the status of this case WITHIN THIRTY DAYS of the date of this Order, unless, in the interim, Plaintiff has either (1) filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of this action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), or (2) filed a motion for default judgment against TSM and effected service of process over PPLG LLC and Omega Matrice Morris. Status Report due by 11/14/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/12/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
16 16 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 10/11 3:39 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Ronald Fuller. (Parker, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 09/28 3:34 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER why the Court should not dismiss his claims against PPLG, LLC, and Omega Matrice Morris without prejudice for failure to effect service, and why the Court should allow an extension of time to effect service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/28/2022. (daf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
14 14 misc Mail Returned Tue 09/27 2:43 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted to PPLG 1943 as to5 Summons Issued,3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,4 Order,1 Complaint. Attachments: #1 contents in envelope (7021 0350 0001 8412 1502)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Mail Returned Tue 09/27 2:38 PM
Summons returned Unexecuted sent to Omega 1943 as to5 Summons Issued,4 Order,1 Complaint. (7021 0350 0001 8412 0895) Attachments: #1 contents in envelope (vb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/13 10:19 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting11 Request for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 10/12/2022, unless Plaintiff has filed a motion for default judgment against TSM LLC in the interim. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/13/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 09/12 9:22 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Ronald Fuller. (Hilton, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/29 2:15 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant TSM LLC should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order unless he has filed a motion for default judgment in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/29/2022. (daf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
9 9 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/21 3:01 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant TSM LLC (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
8 8 notice Application to Enter Default Tue 07/12 4:41 PM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant PPLG LLC, et al . (Hilton, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/29 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant TSM LLC. TSM LLC served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (tla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Green Card
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/10 11:49 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Ronald Fuller re4 Order, Notice of USM 285 Forms and Copies Being Mailed to Clerk (Hilton, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USM 285 Form for PPLG LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit USM 285 Form for Omega Matrice Morris,
Att: 3 Exhibit USM 285 Form for TSM LLC
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Omega Matrice Morris, PPLG LLC, and TSM LLC. (daf)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/13 2:37 PM
ORDER - The Court edits ECF No.3 nunc pro tunc to reflect that if Plantiff submits the required Marshal Service Forms and service copies of the Complaint, the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve by certified mail upon Defendants a summons, a copy of the Complaint, and this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/13/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/13 1:51 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/13/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/13 1:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald Fuller. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/12 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Fuller. (Hilton, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,
Att: 2 Summons Form for TSM LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Form for PPLG LLC,
Att: 4 Summons Form for Omega Morris,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet