Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-19637

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:22-ap-01091
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2022
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
First American Title Co
Represented By
First American Title Co
contact info
Defendant
Florence Watson
Represented By
Florence Watson
contact info
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Represented By
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
contact info
Defendant
Merscorp Holdings, Inc
Represented By
Merscorp Holdings, Inc
contact info
Defendant
CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1
Represented By
CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1
contact info
Defendant
Roy Lacey
Represented By
Roy Lacey
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Ewald
Represented By
Danielle Ewald
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Scott
Represented By
Jennifer Scott
contact info
Defendant
David Nilsen
Represented By
David Nilsen
contact info
Defendant
Frank Lenartowicz
Represented By
Frank Lenartowicz
contact info
Defendant
Prestige Title Agency, Inc
130 Pompton Avenue
Verona, NJ 07044
Represented By
Prestige Title Agency, Inc
contact info
Defendant
United General Title Insurance Company
8310 South Valley Highway Road
Englewood, CO 80112
Represented By
United General Title Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Caliber Home Loans, Inc
3701 Regent Boulevard
Irving, TX 75063
Represented By
Caliber Home Loans, Inc
contact info
Defendant
American Security Insurance Company
Represented By
American Security Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Aurora Commercial Corp
1000 West Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Aurora Commercial Corp
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-100
Represented By
John Does 1-100
contact info
Defendant
ABC Company 1-100
Represented By
ABC Company 1-100
contact info
Defendant
Bank of New York Mellon
240 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Bank of New York Mellon
contact info
Defendant
Equity Source Home Loans, LLC
1120 Campus Drive
Morganville, NJ 07751
Represented By
Equity Source Home Loans, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony L Affatati
Represented By
Anthony L Affatati
contact info
Defendant
Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By
Chase Home Finance, LLC
contact info
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase, N.A
270 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
J.P. Morgan Chase, N.A
contact info
Defendant
Mary Jo McGowan
Represented By
Mary Jo McGowan
contact info
Defendant
Crystal Moore
Represented By
Crystal Moore
contact info
Defendant
Maria Leonor Gerholdt
Represented By
Maria Leonor Gerholdt
contact info
Defendant
Western Thrift & Loan
580 East Plumb Lake
Reno, NV 89502
Represented By
Western Thrift & Loan
contact info
Defendant
Jay Trail
Represented By
Jay Trail
contact info
Defendant
Accredited Home Lenders Inc
15909 Avenue of Science
San Diego, CA 92128
Represented By
Accredited Home Lenders Inc
contact info
Defendant
Lenders First Choice
3850 Royal Avenue
Simi Valley, CA 93063
Represented By
Lenders First Choice
contact info
Defendant
Cecilia Guizar-Rodriguez
Represented By
Cecilia Guizar-Rodriguez
contact info
Defendant
The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc
Represented By
The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Ida Singletary
169 Van Horne Street
Jersey City, NJ 07304
Represented By
Ida Singletary
contact info
Plaintiff
Billy E Singletary
169 Van Horne Street
Jersey City, NJ 07304
Represented By
Billy E Singletary
contact info

GPO Feb 21 2024
DECISION RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. (related document:20 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Bank of New York Mellon, Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Defendant Merscorp Holdings, Inc, Defendant CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/21/2024. (zlh)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 05/13 11:08 AM
Adversary Case (2:22-ap-1091) Closed. (zlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
77 77 misc Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/08 11:40 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: CIT Group and Consumer Finance Inc. Related [+] filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of Billy E Singletary, Ida Singletary. (Goldstein, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Billy E Singletary, Plaintiff Ida Singletary,43 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Billy E Singletary
76 76 misc Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/08 9:36 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA and Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Related [+] filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of Billy E Singletary, Ida Singletary. (Goldstein, Scott)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Billy E Singletary, Plaintiff Ida Singletary,43 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Billy E Singletary