Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:22-ap-03018
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cleveland United Methodist Church
Represented By
Cleveland United Methodist Church
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
10 10 court Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Wed 07/31 4:19 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] (Earl, Heather)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Order on Motion for Entry of Default, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,9 Letter filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
9 9 misc Letter Wed 07/31 2:26 PM
Letter Requesting Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Earl, Heather)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Order on Motion for Entry of Default, Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 10/04 9:44 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Related [+], Granting Motion for Default Judgment (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 5 5
Thursday, September 29, 2022
7 7 court Hearing held Thu 09/29 3:51 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee, Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/14 1:49 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 9/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee, Motion for Default Judgment
5 5 motion Default Judgment Wed 09/14 1:48 PM
Motion for Entry of Default , Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, April 15, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/15 1:45 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 04/12 4:29 PM
Summons and notice issued to Cleveland United Methodist Church Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, April 08, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 04/08 4:06 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-03018 KRH] ) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A34321259, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/08 3:56 PM
Adversary case 22-03018 Complaint against Cleveland United Methodist Church filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]