Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-30849

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:22-ap-03114
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2022
Terminated:Jun 09, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Harandi's Corporation, d/b/a Automall 59
9611 Southwest Freeway
Houston, TX 77074
Represented By
Harandi's Corporation, d/b/a Automall 59
contact info
Plaintiff
La Juan De Shun Hardy
2606 Creston Dr
Houston, TX 77026
Represented By
Charles Anthony Newton
Newtons Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Saturday, June 11, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/11 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Order
Thursday, June 09, 2022
7 7 order Generic Order Thu 06/09 12:28 PM
Order Closing Adversary Proceeding. Signed on 6/9/2022 Related [+] (kpico)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/09 12:29 PM
Adversary Case 4:22-ap-3114 Closed. (kpico)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/07 1:39 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by La Juan De Shun Hardy(Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 12, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/12 3:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Harandi's Corporation, d/b/a Automall 59 4/19/2022. (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
crditcrd none Thu 04/14 8:48 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-03114 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 0, Fee waived. Fee amount $ 350.00. (GloriaVasquez)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
4 4 notice Notice Tue 04/12 4:58 PM
Notice of the Turnover of Vehicle . Related [+] Filed by La Juan De Shun Hardy (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 04/12 8:58 AM
Summons Issued on Harandi's Corporation, d/b/a Automall 59 Date Issued 4/12/2022. (JacquelineMata)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 04/11 2:02 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Harandi's Corporation, d/b/a Automall 59. (Filed By La Juan De Shun Hardy ). (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 04/11 1:59 PM
Adversary case 22-03114 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint - Turnover of a vehicle and violation of automatic stay by La Juan De Shun Hardy against Harandi's Corporation, d/b/a Automall 59. Fee Amount $350 (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet