Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mitchell S Goldberg
Case #: 2:22-cv-01428
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2022
Terminated:May 23, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 09, 2022 6:28 AM EDT
Defendant
HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By
JOSHUA BRAND
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS AND HELPERS
Defendant
STEPHEN M LALUMERA
Represented By
NANCY A. CONRAD
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Defendant
PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC.
Represented By
NANCY A. CONRAD
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DENNIS ROSCOE
Represented By
IAN M. BRYSON
Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 20, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/20 7:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DENNIS ROSCOE As To ALL PARTIES WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 05/12 2:35 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) Proposed Order Staying Action Pending Arbitration by HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC. (BRAND, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/09 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA BRAND on behalf of HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC with Certificate of Service(BRAND, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
10 10 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Mon 05/09 12:37 PM
ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND DEFENDANTS STEPHEN M LALUMERA AND PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC., ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 5/23/22, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/9/22. 5/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 05/09 9:17 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney), for Extension of Time to file Answer by STEPHEN M LALUMERA, PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC..(CONRAD, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 06, 2022
8 8 misc Letter Fri 05/06 4:26 PM
Letter dated May 6, 2022 by HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC. (BRAND, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 1:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS ROSCOE re: Dennis Richman served Summons and Complaint upon STEPHEN M LALUMERA by Personal Service. STEPHEN M LALUMERA served on 4/19/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 1:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS ROSCOE re: George Phillips served Summons and Complaint upon INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS AND HELPERS by Corporate Service. INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS AND HELPERS served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS ROSCOE re: Frederic David served Summons and Complaint upon HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC by Corporate Service. HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 4/15/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/06 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS ROSCOE re: Jacob T. Booth served Summons and Complaint upon PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC. by Corporate Service. PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC. served on 4/15/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. (BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/14 1:35 PM
12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 10:40 AM
Summons Issued as to HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS AND HELPERS, STEPHEN M LALUMERA, PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC.. (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 04/12 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against HKA ENTERPRISES, LLC, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF BOILERMAKERS, IRON SHIP BUILDERS, BLACKSMITHS, FORGERS AND HELPERS, STEPHEN M LALUMERA, PHILLY SHIPYARD, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15852415.), filed by DENNIS ROSCOE.(BRYSON, IAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form