Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-05141
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00784
Last checked: Monday Oct 10, 2022 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
Nicholas S. Jefferson
Represented By
STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Johnson Becker Pllc - Saint Paul Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/19 8:17 AM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by Nicholas S. Jefferson. (HAUER, STACY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
8 8 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/13 4:04 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/3/2022 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 04/13 2:16 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00784. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/13 11:18 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-150) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgeres.(kt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
5 5 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-784 JRT/TNL. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9421392) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet