California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Case #: 2:22-cv-02498
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:3205 Garnishment
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2022
Terminated:Jul 25, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 11, 2022 1:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Sam Sarkis Solakyan
Garnishee
Wells Fargo Bank NA
Legal Support PO Box 29779
Phoenix, AZ 85038
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Zoran Joseph Segina
Ausa - Us Attorney Office
contact info
Robert Ira Lester
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 29, 2022
16 16 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 09/29 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Order,,15 TO DEFENDANT AND GARNISHEE [WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.] served on 9/29/2022. (Lester, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/28 2:10 PM
CORRECTED FINAL ORDER OFCONTINUING GARNISHMENT[ECF NO.14 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Pursuant to the request of plaintiff United States for a corrected final order of continuing garnishment as to garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Garnishee), and for good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that: Garnishee shall pay immediately to the United States, as instructed in this Corrected Order, all funds that it has been obligated to withhold and retain since the date it was served with the writ of continuing garnishment, together with all future allotments. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
14 14 3 pgs motion Order Thu 09/15 2:55 PM
REQUEST for Order for TO CORRECT FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lester, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 09/14 11:18 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Ira Lester counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Zoran J. Segina is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lester, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 09/14 10:55 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Ira Lester counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Robert I. Lester as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Lester, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Issuance Tue 07/26 3:31 PM
FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [ECF10 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Pursuant to the request of plaintiff United States for a final order of continuing garnishment as to garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and for good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that: Garnishee shall pay immediately to the United States, as instructed in this Order, all funds that it has been obligated to "withhold and retain" since the date it was served with the writ of continuing garnishment, together with all future allotments. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
10 10 motion Issuance Thu 07/07 2:36 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.] filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Segina, Zoran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 02, 2022
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 06/02 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment5 , Order,4 , Notice (Other)6 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on June 1, 2022. (Segina, Zoran)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
8 8 respoth Answer of Garnishee to Application for Writ of Garnishment Thu 05/26 11:56 AM
ANSWER of Garnishee to Writ of Garnishment filed by Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank NA. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 05/19 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment5 , Order,4 Via Certified Mail served on May 19, 2022. (Segina, Zoran)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/16 4:09 PM
NOTICE CLERKS 28 U.S.C. § 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (yl)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Writ of Garnishment Issued Mon 05/16 4:07 PM
WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/16 4:05 PM
ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT [ECF NO. 1] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong1 . IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a writ of continuing garnishment with respect to Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Clerk's notice of continuing post judgment garnishment to Solakyan by signing the forms submitted by the United States. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
3 3 Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:22-cv-02498-MEMF. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 04/14 11:21 AM
Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:22-cv-02498-MEMF. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/13 3:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Segina, Zoran)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/13 3:02 PM
APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. and CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. § 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Zoran Joseph Segina added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Segina, Zoran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 4 Clerk's 28 U.S.C. § 3202(b) Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment to Debtor,
Att: 5 Proposed Order