Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:22-cv-00837
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2022
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: Monday Oct 10, 2022 5:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Mike Grimm
P.O. Box 2329
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Harold D Jones
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
Mario Sinacola & Sons Excavating Inc
Represented By
Harold D Jones
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie Lutz
c/o 3109 Carlisle Street
Dallas, TX 75204
Represented By
John Henry Crouch, IV
Kilgore & Kilgore Pplc
contact info

GPO Feb 16 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot 42 Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence. The Court dismisses Lutz's FMLA and ADA claims. Lutz has no further claims remaining. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 2/16/2024) (axm)

Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
62 62 appeal USCA Judgment/Mandate Mon 12/09 1:40 PM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to59 Notice of Appeal filed by Debbie Lutz. The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Issued as Mandate: 12/9/2024. (axm)
Related: [-]
61 61 appeal USCA Opinion Mon 12/09 1:38 PM
Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re59 Notice of Appeal filed by Debbie Lutz. AFFIRMED. (axm)
Related: [-]