Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Referred: Jared M Strauss
Case #: 0:22-cv-60734
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2022
Terminated:Aug 22, 2022
Last checked: Monday Oct 10, 2022 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Ivan Blanco
Represented By
Holly Griffin Goodman
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Brian M. McPherson
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Defendant
Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation
Represented By
Holly Griffin Goodman
Gunster, Yoakley , Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Brian M. McPherson
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Mediator
Robyn S. Hankins
Robyn S. Hankins, PL 4600 Military Trail #217
Jupiter, FL 33458
Plaintiff
Briana Dimascio
Represented By
Jason Daniel Berkowitz
Bt Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Anisley Tarragona
Bt Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Saturday, September 03, 2022
41 41 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 09/06 5:52 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
40 40 misc Settlement Agreement - aty Wed 08/31 7:43 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT [Joint Motion to Approve FLSA Settlement and Dismiss Case With Prejudice] by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation(Goodman, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement and FLSA Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jason D. Berkowitz
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
39 39 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 08/23 7:25 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR COURT APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
38 38 order Administrative Order Mon 08/22 11:41 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
Related: [-]
37 37 adr Mediation Report Mon 08/22 9:39 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Robyn Hankins. Disposition: Settled in full.(Hankins, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 08/03 7:58 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Mon 08/01 5:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Their Amended Answer to Assert Additional Affirmative Defenses by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation.(McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Combined Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 08/01 8:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting34 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend their Answer to Assert Additional Affirmative Defenses. Defendants' [34-1] Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses shall be deemed FILED. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/1/2022. (ob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
33 33 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 07/12 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. and Filing Proposed Order Setting Mediation Selected/Added Robyn S. Hankins as Mediator.(Goodman, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation
Friday, July 08, 2022
31 31 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 07/08 12:32 PM
Report on Settlement Conference. Case did not settle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 7/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 07/08 12:45 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss: Settlement Conference held on 7/8/2022. Impasse. Attorney Appearance(s): Brian M. McPherson, Ivan Blanco, Farah Bridges. Jason Daniel Berkowitz, Briana Dimascio, (Digital ZOOM RECORDED) (at)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
30 30 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 07/01 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Compliance (Joint) by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation re22 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Goodman, Holly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
29 29 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 06/22 10:10 AM
DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
28 28 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/22 9:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 2/21/2023 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2022., Discovery due by 11/1/2022., Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2022., Mediation Deadline 11/8/2022., In Limine Motions due by 12/13/2022., Motions due by 11/15/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/13/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
27 27 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 06/14 1:21 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation(McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/14 1:05 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation (McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
25 25 respm Response/Reply (Other) Thu 06/02 1:28 PM
Defendant's RESPONSE to16 Statement of Claim by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation. (McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 06/02 1:17 PM
Defendants' Combined ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation. (McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
23 23 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/01 4:38 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Briana Dimascio (Berkowitz, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
22 22 5 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/31 4:30 PM
Order Setting Settlement Conference via Video Conference for 7/8/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Conferral required by 6/24/2022. Joint Notice of Compliance and Confidential Settlement Statements due by 7/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 05/26 9:22 AM
ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Due by 6/14/2022. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 05/25 11:54 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re18 Order to Show Cause by Briana Dimascio.(Berkowitz, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
18 18 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 05/25 10:02 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
Related: [-]
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/25 12:45 PM
Upon receipt of19 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and review of the docket, the Court's Order to Show Cause18 is hereby STRICKEN given Plaintiff's timely compliance with the Court's Order of Requirements10 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/25/2022. (ob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Thu 05/19 11:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Briana Dimascio.(Tarragona, Anisley)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Statement Thu 05/19 11:47 AM
Statement of: Claim by Briana Dimascio (Tarragona, Anisley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/18 3:13 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation.(McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/18 8:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall respond on or before May 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/18/2022. (ob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/17 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Griffin Goodman on behalf of Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation. Attorney Holly Griffin Goodman added to party Ivan Blanco(pty:dft), Attorney Holly Griffin Goodman added to party Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation(pty:dft). (Goodman, Holly)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/17 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. McPherson on behalf of Ivan Blanco. Attorney Brian M. McPherson added to party Ivan Blanco(pty:dft). (McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 05/17 11:06 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER re10 Order in Actions Brought Under the Fair Labor Standards Act. The District Court has entered an Order, DE10 , referring the case to me for a settlement conference. Accordingly, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer to determine possible dates on which to conduct the settlement conference. Prior to the due date for Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim, Plaintiff's counsel shall email my Chambers at strauss@flsd.uscourts.gov with at least 3 dates on which the parties and their counsel are available for the settlement conference. Following the submission of proposed dates, I will enter an order setting the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/17/2022. (emd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
10 10 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/17 10:53 AM
ORDER IN ACTIONS Brought Under the Fair Labor Standards Act, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 05/13 12:24 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Briana Dimascio. Ivan Blanco served on 4/28/2022, response/answer due 5/19/2022. (Tarragona, Anisley)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 05/13 12:21 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Briana Dimascio. Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation served on 4/19/2022, response/answer due 5/24/2022. (Tarragona, Anisley)
Related: [-]
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/13 11:49 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (ob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/10 2:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation.(McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/10 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. McPherson on behalf of Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation. Attorney Brian M. McPherson added to party Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation(pty:dft). (McPherson, Brian)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 05/10 2:56 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Defendant Cleveland Clinic's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's response is due on or before May 24, 2022 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/10/2022. (ob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/14 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Ivan Blanco, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/13 7:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Ivan Blanco, CLEVELAND CLINIC FLORIDA HEALTH SYSTEM NONPROFIT CORPORATION. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15558096, filed by Briana Dimascio.(Tarragona, Anisley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 04/14 10:09 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
Related: [-]