California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00101
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Apr 14, 2022 12:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Jesus Gomez (1)
Represented By
Armilla Teresita Staley-Ngomo
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Gerloni Cotton
Federal Defenders Of San Diego Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
James Redd
Doj-Usao
contact info
David M. Berman
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Sep 08 2022
JUDGMENT as to Jesus Gomez (1), Count(s) 1, BOP for a term of 24 months; Supervised Release for 3 years; Special Assessment $100 Imposed; Fine Waived. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez (ddf)

Docket last updated: 04/14/2022 1:19 AM PDT
Friday, December 17, 2021
Arrest of Jesus Gomez (no document attached) (lrc) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Gomez.(lrc) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Gomez: Initial Appearance set for 12/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (ekb) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Gomez held on 12/17/2021. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Jesus Gomez. Bond set as to Jesus Gomez (1) $20,000 PS secured by 2 FRAs(1 related) and $2,000 cash deposit. Defendant may not be released until bed space is available at residential drug treatment facility. Rule 5 advisement provided.( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/30/21 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Arraignment set for 1/13/22 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. ) (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 12/17/2021 BLM 21-1:2:21-3:30). (Plaintiff Attorney Elizabet Brown AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Theo Torres FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 12/20/2021 to add release condition (mme). [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Gomez (no document attached) (aje) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jesus Gomez (1) $20,000 PS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/17/2021. (smy1) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Jesus Gomez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/17/21. (no document attached) (aje) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jesus Gomez (ggv) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David M. Berman appearing for USA. (Berman, David)Attorney David M. Berman added to party USA(pty:pla) (jcj). [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Armilla Teresita Staley-Ngomo appearing for Jesus Gomez (Staley-Ngomo, Armilla)Attorney Armilla Teresita Staley-Ngomo added to party Jesus Gomez(pty:dft)(jcj). [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Jesus Gomez (Staley-Ngomo, Armilla) (smy1). [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Jesus Gomez. Preliminary Hearing set for 1/13/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/22/2021. (nbp) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
12 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jesus Gomez. On the Court's own motion, Arraignment and Preliminary Hearing reset for 1/13/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (nbp) [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
13 13 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Berman, David) (sjt). [3:21-mj-04930-BLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Defendant present in Court. Arraignment on Information as to Jesus Gomez (1) Count 1 held on 1/13/2022. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 2/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Linda Lopez. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 1/13/2022 MSB 1:40-1:54). (Plaintiff Attorney Emma Shinn, AUSA S/A for David Berman). (Defendant Attorney Stephen Piotrkowski, FD S/A for Armilla Staley-Ngomo, FD). (mxn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
14 14 INFORMATION as to Jesus Gomez (1) count(s) 1. (ddf) (jcj).
Related: [-]