Kansas District Court
Judge:Carlos Murguia
Referred: Teresa J James
Case #: 2:14-cv-02430
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2014
Terminated:Aug 03, 2016
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 8:48 PM CDT
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Rodney E. Loomer
Turner, Reid, Duncan, Loomer & Patton, PC
contact info
Brad E. Miller
Turner, Reid, Duncan, Loomer & Patton, PC
contact info
Steven E. Ward
Turner, Reid, Duncan, Loomer & Patton, PC
contact info
Sherry A. Rozell
Turner, Reid, Duncan, Loomer & Patton, PC
contact info
Objector
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Kenneth J. Morton
Frischer & Schaffer, Chartered
contact info
Plaintiff
Georgia Lee Iocco
Represented By
Eric Kjorlie
Kjorlie Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane L. McDermed
Represented By
Eric Kjorlie
Kjorlie Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul C. McDermed
Represented By
Eric Kjorlie
Kjorlie Law Office
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2015
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 53 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike the Supplemental Attachments to Plaintiffs' Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/3/2015. (byk)
GPO Mar 17 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 93 Plaintiffs' Motion to Preserve and Compel Answers and Production of Documents Pertaining to Non-Litigated Claims; granting 124 Defendant's Motion to Strike; and striking 115 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs, however, may file a motion for leave to depose Mr. Krishnaswami a second time in strict accordance with the requirements set out in the Order. Any such motion must be filed by 3/25/2016. To expedite consideration of the motion, Defendant's response to any such motion will be due seven days after the motion is filed and no reply will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/17/2016. (byk)
GPO Apr 01 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/1/2016. (byk)
GPO Apr 08 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 140 Motion for Leave of Court to Take the Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Designated Corporate Representative. Each party shall bear its own costs related to this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/8/2016. (ck)
GPO Aug 03 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 101 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. Shawn Parcells; granting 102 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mr. David McLellan; denying 111 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Shawn Parcells; denying 112 MOTION for extension of time Opposed Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Respond to Defendant Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert David McLellan. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/3/16. (hw)
GPO Aug 03 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/3/16. (hw)
GPO Apr 26 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 175 Motion for Reconsideration, and 175 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 04/26/2017. (mg)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
186 186 appeal Mandate Tue 03/20 11:00 AM
APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: AFFIRMING decision of the District Court. (Appeal No. 17-3105 (Attachment: #1 Transmittal Letter)(kao)
Related: [-]