Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:22-cv-00265
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2022
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court for the Twenty-Third Judicial Distri, 6760
Last checked: Monday Oct 10, 2022 5:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
Represented By
Lorne G. Hiller
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Matthew S. Ponzi
Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Khushi Partnership
5704 Portsmouth Place
Brentwood, TN 37027
Represented By
Toby Gammill
Gammill Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
H. Patel and J. Patel
Terminated: 07/25/2022
DBA Khushi Partnership 5704 Portsmouth Place
Brentwood, TN 37027
Represented By
Alexandria Scarbrough Fisher
Morgan & Morgan (nashville Office)
contact info
Toby Gammill
Gammill Law Group
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2023
MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Before the court is plaintiff Khushi Partnership's Motion to Compel Appraisal (Doc. No. 26), which defendant Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company ("BHHIC") opposes as premature and potentially unnecessary (Doc. No. 29). For the reasons set forth herein, the plaintiff's Motion to Compel Appraisal (Doc. No. 26) is GRANTED, and the parties are ORDERED to proceed with an appraisal in accordance with the procedure for doing so outlined in the Policy, and to do so in a prompt and reasonable manner. The court notes that the plaintiff has not requested a stay during the appraisal, nor do the circumstances indicate that a stay would be necessary or advisable. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/13/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/28 10:54 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per DE76 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Judge Trauger's Chamber. No Order to enter.*** (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
76 76 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 9:08 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Hiller, Lorne)
Related: [-]