Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:22-cv-00912
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2022
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 11, 2022 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Jacob Flax
Represented By
Jeffrey P Bowman
Bowman Jarashow Law LLC
contact info
Frank Paul Lozupone, III
Bowman Jarashow Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
South River Mortgage, LLC
1 Park Place Suite 540
Annapolis, MD 21401
Represented By
Jonathan Wolfe Greenbaum
Coburn And Greenbaum PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 12, 2024
48 48 order Settlement Order Fri 07/12 9:40 AM
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 60 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/12/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
47 47 misc Status Report Mon 07/01 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT by South River Mortgage, LLC(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/16 7:50 AM
ORDER directing that Defendant Jacob Flax shall provide his phone to Plaintiff South River's forensic expert so that the forensic expert may search for communications that are responsive to the Plaintiff's document requests; further ordered that by 12:00 PM this Friday, 5/17/2024, Plaintiff will submit notice to this Court and the parties identifying the forensic expert to perform the search and including details as to when Flax's phone will be turned over and the duration of the search. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/15/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
45 45 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/28 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Nehls, Nehls on behalf of South River Mortgage, LLC (Nehls, Natalie)
Related: [-]
44 44 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/28 2:12 PM
ORDER Withdrawing43 Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery; Denying32 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/28/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/23 3:10 PM
Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2024 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
43 43 motion Compel Mon 03/18 12:04 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery by South River Mortgage, LLC(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 03/18 8:18 AM
QC NOTICE:41 Notice (Other) filed by Jacob Flax was filed incorrectly. **Discovery, including Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures, should not be filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/15 5:28 PM
NOTICE by Jacob Flax Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure(Lozupone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Monday, February 26, 2024
40 40 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 02/26 12:02 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving39 Joint Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/26/2024. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
39 39 motion Protective Order Fri 02/23 9:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jacob Flax(Lozupone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Other Relief Mon 12/18 1:33 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving37 Proposed Joint Scheduling Order; Status Report due 6/15/2024. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/18/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
37 37 motion Other Relief Fri 12/15 4:21 PM
Proposed MOTION for Other Relief Proposed Joint Scheduling Order by South River Mortgage, LLC(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
36 36 corresp Conference - requesting Tue 12/12 4:31 PM
Request for Conference(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/31 1:09 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin as referral Judge. Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Mag. Hurson no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/30 10:40 AM
NOTICE by South River Mortgage, LLC re33 Response in Opposition to Motion Proposed Order (Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/30 9:56 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant Jacob Flax's Motion To Temporarily Stay Proceeding filed by South River Mortgage, LLC.(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 10/30 10:06 AM
QC NOTICE:33 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by South River Mortgage, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to 33 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
32 32 motion Stay Fri 10/20 2:58 PM
MOTION to Stay by Jacob Flax(Lozupone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1. State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, October 13, 2023
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/13 12:41 PM
NOTICE by South River Mortgage, LLC Letter to Judge Richard D. Bennett Requesting A Scheduling Order (Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Mon 07/17 10:03 AM
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 7/14/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
29 29 1 pgs corresp Status Report Submitted Wed 07/05 9:59 PM
Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report by Jacob Flax (Lozupone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
28 28 2 pgs corresp Status Report Submitted Mon 04/24 2:34 PM
Status Report Submitted Letter to Brendan A. Hurson Re South River Mortgage, LLC v. Jacob Flax by South River Mortgage, LLC (Coburn, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
27 27 corresp Status Report Submitted Wed 03/08 3:39 PM
Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report by Jacob Flax (Lozupone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
order Order Mon 11/28 2:51 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to postpone the settlement conference currently scheduled for December 6, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to provide a status update to the Court every thirty (30) days and to contact my chambers to promptly reschedule the settlement conference as soon as Defendant's criminal charges are resolved in Anne Arundel District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 11/28/2022. (tla, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
25 25 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 11/23 10:11 AM
Joint Correspondence re: Settlement Conference (Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 11/23 8:39 AM
QC NOTICE:23 Motion to Continue filed by South River Mortgage, LLC was filed incorrectly. **As filing is a correspondence, not a motion, please refile using the event under Correspondence > Miscellaneous and enhance the docket text as needed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
23 23 motion Continue Tue 11/22 4:25 PM
MOTION to Continue Letter to Brendan A. Hurson to Reschedule The Settlement Conference by South River Mortgage, LLC(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 09/15 3:39 PM
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 9/15/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 09/13 1:14 PM
ORDER granting20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 09/12 5:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Jacob Flax.(Bowman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 09/12 11:13 AM
Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2022 before Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
19 19 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 06/16 3:44 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 6/16/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/09 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Bowman on behalf of Jacob Flax (Bowman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/09 10:55 AM
(FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Paul Lozupone, III on behalf of Jacob Flax (Lozupone, Frank) Modified on 6/9/2022 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 06/09 2:29 PM
QC NOTICE:16 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacob Flax was filed incorrectly. **Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login to be added as counsel to a case. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/01 4:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/1/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs corresp Settlement Conference - requesting Wed 06/01 3:53 PM
Settlement Conference - requesting (Bowman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/19 11:22 AM
ORDER re: Informal Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/19/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 5 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 05/19 11:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/3/2022. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/19/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/19 10:29 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jacob Flax.(Lozupone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/17 12:31 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
6 6 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Mon 05/02 9:16 AM
ORDER directing South River Mortgage, LLC to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 6/24/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if South River Mortgage, LLC files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 5/2/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Mon 05/02 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 7 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. South River Mortgage, LLC must correct the following error(s): **Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge , both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Mon 05/02 1:35 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 5/2/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/15 2:04 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Jacob Flax.(dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Fri 04/15 1:50 PM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 4/15/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 04/15 1:24 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by South River Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent South River Mortgage, LLC, Corporate Parent South River Mortgage, LLC for South River Mortgage, LLC.(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Fri 04/15 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Jacob Flax, South River Mortgage, LLC or counsel for Jacob Flax, South River Mortgage, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/29/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/14 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief against South River Mortgage, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9877865.), filed by South River Mortgage, LLC.(Greenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/14 1:12 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]