New Jersey District Court
Judge:Karen M Williams
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:22-cv-02217
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2022
Re-opened:Apr 28, 2023
Terminated:Apr 28, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Cape May County, CPM-L-000041-22
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
MINDOULA HEALTH, INC.
Represented By
JAMES J. PANZINI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
POOJA BHUTANI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
Plaintiff
MELISSA ARNOTT
MCOMBER MCOMBER & LUBER, P.C. 39 EAST MAIN STREET
MARLTON, NJ 08053
Represented By
KELLY ESTEVAM ADLER
Mcomber Mcomber & Luber
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 28, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 04/28 4:13 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/28/23. (nar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 02/23 11:20 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/22/2023. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
29 29 1 pgs minutes Settlement Conference Fri 02/24 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2023. Zoom Conference held on the record. Settlement conference agreement put on the record. A 60-Day Order Administratively Terminating the case will be issued. (Court Reporter, Recorded) (dmr)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 02/23 4:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Zoom Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
27 27 order Order Thu 02/16 8:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: The time for the settlement conference via Zoom scheduled for February 22, 2023 will be 2:00 PM as stated in ECF No. 24. The time stated in ECF No. 26 was entered in error. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/16/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
26 26 order Order Wed 02/15 1:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: Having received and reviewed Plaintiff's letter request, ECF No. 25, and for good cause shown, the telephone status conference scheduled on February 16, 2023, is ADJOURNED . The Court will conduct a settlement conference on February 22, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom Video, as previously scheduled. See ECF No. 22. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/15/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
25 25 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 02/14 3:06 PM
Letter from Kelly E. Adler, Esq.. (ADLER, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
24 24 order Order Mon 01/23 12:04 PM
TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, the Court converts the in-person settlement conference scheduled for February 22, 2023, at 2:00 PM, to Zoom . Prior to the conference, counsel will receive a link for the conference via email. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/23/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
23 23 misc Letter Fri 01/20 11:21 AM
Letter from James J. Panzini re 22 Order,,. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
22 22 order Order Mon 01/09 2:22 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person settlement conference on February 22, 2023, at 2:00 PM , All counsel shall report to the Mitchell H. Cohen Building & U.S. Courthouse, 4th & Cooper Streets, Room 2040, Camden, NJ 08101. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than five (5) double-spaced pages, including exhibits, via email to njdnef_pascal@njd.uscourts.gov at least three (3) business days before the scheduled conference. If additional exhibits are desired, the parties may offer them during the conference. Counsel can refer to the courts website for Judicial preferences. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/9/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/15 3:12 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 2/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 12/15/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 12/16 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/15/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
20 20 order Order Thu 10/20 11:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having conducted a telephone status conference with the parties, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Courts August 18, 2022 Scheduling Order, ECF No. 19, shall remain in effect. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on December 15, 2022, at 11:30 a.m . Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852, access code 1051623# to connect to the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 10/20/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 10/20 3:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/20/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/18 3:58 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/20/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 12/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/18/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
18 18 misc Letter Mon 08/15 4:17 PM
Letter from James J. Panzini and Pooja Bhutani, jointly with Plaintiff's counsel re12 Scheduling Order,. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
17 17 10 pgs order Discovery Confidentiality Order Wed 07/06 4:51 PM
Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/6/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
16 16 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) Thu 06/30 6:42 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC.. Amendment to15 Letter, enclosing *Amended* Clean and Tracked Versions of Discovery Confidentiality Order (previously filed version, ECF No. 15-1, contained improper placement of exhibit tabs) . (BHUTANI, POOJA)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Thu 06/30 6:32 PM
Letter from Pooja Bhutani, Esq. re. Discovery Confidentiality Order and 502(d) Order for Your Honor's Consideration and Execution re12 Scheduling Order,.(BHUTANI, POOJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tracked and Clean Versions of Discovery Confidentiality Order,
Att: 2 502(d) Order
14 14 misc Letter Thu 06/30 4:54 PM
Letter from Kelly E. Adler. (ADLER, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
order Order Tue 06/28 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 8/31/2022 at 10:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED to 9/1/2022 at 10:00 AM . This will be before Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Counsel shall use the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code 1051623# . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/28/2022. (bda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 06/22 10:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King no longer assigned to case. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/31 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/31/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 11/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2023, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/31/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 05/31 3:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/31/2022 by telephone. Scheduling Order entered (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
order Order Wed 05/25 2:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. The plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/25/22. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
10 10 5 pgs discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 05/24 5:33 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC..(PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
9 9 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Tue 05/17 9:06 AM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by MELISSA ARNOTT. (ADLER, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
8 8 1 pgs misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Mon 05/16 6:02 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC.. (BHUTANI, POOJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
order Order Tue 05/10 9:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on May 31, 2022 at 11:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/10/22. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
6 6 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 05/09 11:42 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 5/31/2022 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/9/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
5 5 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/06 4:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC..(PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 04/19 2:38 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Mindoula Health, Inc...(BHUTANI, POOJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 04/19 9:20 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences. KMW[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (bda)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Tue 04/19 10:53 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Case erroneously referred to Arbitration, please disregard (jab)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/19 2:57 PM
Clerk's Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/6/2022. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/15 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA BHUTANI on behalf of MINDOULA HEALTH, INC. (BHUTANI, POOJA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 04/15 1:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC.. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/15 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number CPM-L-00041-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13339553), filed by MINDOULA HEALTH, INC..(PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Compliance,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Application for the Clerk's Extension of Time
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/18 12:53 PM
Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/19 9:52 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information,Removal-Other Court Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (bda)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Tue 04/19 9:58 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (bda)
Related: [-]