New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:22-cv-02227
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2022
Terminated:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 12, 2022 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB
Represented By
MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Defendant
VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Defendant
VOLVO CAR USA, LLC
Represented By
MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Notice Only
PHV TAREK H. ZOHDY
Notice Only
PHV CODY R. PADGETT
Notice Only
PHV LAURA E. COOLSBY
Plaintiff
ROBERT TUBBE
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Madeja
Represented By
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Johnson
Represented By
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Johnson
Represented By
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DONNA URBEN
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TONI TUBBE
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROLLIE BUCHANAN
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK SILBER
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN SALHANICK
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELSIE SAKS
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIELA KOTOUN
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC KOTOUN
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT HOFFMAN
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PHILIPPE GEYSKENS
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN FLYNN
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KIM FERGUSON
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FRED MARTIN FERGUSON
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVIN CARD
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague
contact info
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
39 39 order Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 05/23 4:15 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 41(a)(1)(A)(II). Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/23/2023. (ld)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
38 38 misc Stipulation Mon 05/22 3:01 PM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 03/22 11:00 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/22/2023. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/22/2023. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
36 36 3 pgs misc Status Report Wed 03/15 11:09 PM
STATUS REPORT Re: Settlement by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
35 35 4 pgs order Order Tue 02/21 12:01 PM
JOINT REPORT RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS PER TEXT ORDER DKT. 33; The Court shall hold any case scheduling in abeyance for an additional thirty (30) days; The Parties shall file a Joint Report Re Status of Settlement no later than March 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/17/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
34 34 4 pgs misc Status Report Tue 02/14 3:05 PM
STATUS REPORT re Settlement Discussions by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
33 33 4 pgs order Order Wed 12/21 2:22 PM
ORDER that the Court shall hold any case scheduling in abeyance for an additional sixty (60) days; The Parties shall file a Joint Report Re Status of Settlement no later than Tuesday February 14, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 12/20/2022. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
32 32 4 pgs misc Status Report Fri 12/16 4:24 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Report re Status of Settlement Discussions by All Plaintiffs. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/23 4:19 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of RACHEL A. STRAUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/23/2022. (wh) (Main Document 31 replaced on 11/23/2022) (wh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
30 30 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/22 2:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel A. Straus by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.(MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/22 3:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel A. Straus . Motion set for 12/19/2022 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
29 29 order Order Tue 11/08 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: As per today's Zoom Initial Scheduling Conference, and for the reasons stated during the Conference and with the parties' consent, the parties shall continue to engage in settlement discussions. The parties' obligations to exchange Rule 26 disclosures and conduct any discovery shall be held in abeyance, pending the outcome of settlement discussions. The parties shall submit a joint letter on or before December 16, 2022, addressing the status of settlement discussions. The Court will issue a Pretrial Scheduling Order in the event the parties do not reach a settlement. Further, for the reasons stated during today's Conference, Defendants' Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, (ECF No. 28), is Denied without prejudice. Defendants shall resubmit the application on consent and in compliance with Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(1)-(3). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Motion filed as ECF No. 28. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/8/22. (jbb)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 11/08 11:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Zoom Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2022. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/07 10:39 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/5/2022 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/04 6:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
27 27 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 11/04 2:58 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
26 26 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Wed 09/14 12:57 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DAVIN CARD, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, KIM FERGUSON, KEVIN FLYNN, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, ROBERT HOFFMAN. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
25 25 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/13 3:30 PM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for at 11/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/13/22. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/12 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC.(MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/12 2:24 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.(MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
22 22 order Stipulation and Order Fri 08/19 11:16 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Amended Complaint. The Court hereby orders that defendants VOLVO CAR USA, LLC's and VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/19/2022. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 08/18 1:40 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Amended Complaint by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/22 1:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB, filed by ELSIE SAKS, ROBERT HOFFMAN, DAVIN CARD, ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DONNA URBEN, MARK SILBER, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, KIM FERGUSON, MARIELA KOTOUN, STEVEN SALHANICK, ROBERT TUBBE, TONI TUBBE, ERIC KOTOUN, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY, KEVIN FLYNN, Kimberly Madeja, Christopher Johnson, Melissa Johnson.(PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
19 19 misc Letter Fri 07/08 3:21 PM
Letter re Christine Arleo Opting out of the class action lawsuit from ROBERT L. ARLEO. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Fri 06/24 11:00 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' Deadline to Amend the Complaint and Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint; Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint: July 22, 2022. Defendants' response to the amended complaint: August 22, 2022 Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion (if necessary): September 22, 2022;etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/24/2022. (ld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation Thu 06/23 2:54 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order regarding Plaintiffs' Deadline to Amend the Complaint and Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB. (MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/23 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW on behalf of VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB (MALLOW, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 05/02 10:22 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tarek H. Zohdy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13378451.) (Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 05/02 10:19 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Laura E. Goolsby to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13378390.) (Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 05/02 10:15 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cody R. Padgett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13378359.) (Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 05/02 10:46 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, CODY R. PADGETT, ESQ., LAURA E. COOLSBY, ESQ., and TAREK H. ZOHDY, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/29 11:13 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tarek Zohdy, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 4/29/2022. (lag, )
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/29 11:09 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Laura E. Goolsby, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 4/29/2022. (lag, )
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/29 11:08 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cody Padgett, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 4/29/2022. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/27 12:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tarek Zohdy by All Plaintiffs.(Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/27 12:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura E. Goolsby by All Plaintiffs.(Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/27 12:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cody Padgett by All Plaintiffs.(Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/27 12:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELSIE SAKS, ROBERT HOFFMAN, DAVIN CARD, ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DONNA URBEN, MARK SILBER, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, KIM FERGUSON, MARIELA KOTOUN, STEVEN SALHANICK, ROBERT TUBBE, TONI TUBBE, ERIC KOTOUN, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY, KEVIN FLYNN. VOLVO CAR USA, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022; VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/27 1:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura E. Goolsby ,9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tarek Zohdy ,7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cody Padgett . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/20 9:45 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/19 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL GERTNER on behalf of ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DAVIN CARD, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, KIM FERGUSON, KEVIN FLYNN, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, ROBERT HOFFMAN, ERIC KOTOUN, MARIELA KOTOUN, ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY, ELSIE SAKS, STEVEN SALHANICK, MARK SILBER, ROBERT TUBBE, TONI TUBBE, DONNA URBEN (GERTNER, ABIGAIL)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/19 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amey J. Park on behalf of ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DAVIN CARD, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, KIM FERGUSON, KEVIN FLYNN, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, ROBERT HOFFMAN, ERIC KOTOUN, MARIELA KOTOUN, ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY, ELSIE SAKS, STEVEN SALHANICK, MARK SILBER, ROBERT TUBBE, TONI TUBBE, DONNA URBEN (Park, Amey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/19 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE LESSER on behalf of ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DAVIN CARD, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, KIM FERGUSON, KEVIN FLYNN, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, ROBERT HOFFMAN, ERIC KOTOUN, MARIELA KOTOUN, ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY, ELSIE SAKS, STEVEN SALHANICK, MARK SILBER, ROBERT TUBBE, TONI TUBBE, DONNA URBEN (LESSER, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
1 1 213 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/15 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against VOLVO CAR USA, LLC, VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13339804) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELSIE SAKS, ROBERT HOFFMAN, DAVIN CARD, ROLLIE BUCHANAN, DONNA URBEN, MARK SILBER, PHILIPPE GEYSKENS, KIM FERGUSON, MARIELA KOTOUN, STEVEN SALHANICK, ROBERT TUBBE, TONI TUBBE, ERIC KOTOUN, FRED MARTIN FERGUSON, ARTHUR KRICHEVSKY, KEVIN FLYNN.(PAUL, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons Volvo Cars of North America LLC,
Att: 5 Summons Volvo Car USA LLC,
Att: 6 Summons Volvo Personvagnar AB
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/15 6:27 PM
Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
Related: [-]