North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Case #: 7:22-cv-00060
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause12:22 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 15, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 15, 2022 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Shawn E. Good
2717 Shandy Lane
Wilmington, NC 28409
Represented By
Joseph E. Zeszotarski, Jr.
Gammon, Howard & Zeszotarski, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Securities and Exchange Commission Atlanta Regional Office 950 East Paces Ferry Road, NE Suite 900
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
Madison G Loomis
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Edward G. Sullivan
U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Joshua C. Hess
Us Securities And Exchange Commission - Atlanta Ofc
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
34 34 order Judgment Wed 10/16 5:04 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/16/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
33 33 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 10/16 5:01 PM
ORDER - Defendant is liable for disgorgement in the amount of $3,147,564.75 and prejudgment interest in the amount of $283,483.49, for a total sum of $3,431,048.24. The disgorgement and prejudgment interest in this order are deemed satisfied by the restitution ordered in United States v. Shawn Edward Good, No. 7:22-CR-96 (E.D.N.C.). In light of defendant's 87-month prison sentence, plaintiff has elected to forego the civil penalty. Final judgment includes this order and the terms of the court's permanent injunction of July 15, 2022. The clerk SHALL enter judgment against defendant. The court RETAINS jurisdiction to enforce its terms. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/16/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Fri 09/27 3:17 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding28 MOTION for Summary Judgment SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Shawn Good and to Set Distorgement and Prejudgment Interest, But Deem The Amounts Satisfied by the Judgment Against Good in Related Criminal Case. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
32 32 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/21 7:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion regarding28 MOTION for Summary Judgment SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Shawn Good and to Set Distorgement and Prejudgment Interest, But Deem The Amounts Satisfied by the Judgment Against Good in Related Cri filed by Shawn E. Good. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
31 31 respm Appendix to the Statement of Facts Wed 07/31 10:56 AM
Appendix to the Statement of Facts regarding28 MOTION for Summary Judgment SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Shawn Good and to Set Distorgement and Prejudgment Interest, But Deem The Amounts Satisfied by the Judgment Against Good in Related Cri minal Case filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Consent),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Order of Court),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Declaration of Tiffany Kunkle),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Prejudgment Interest Calculation)
30 30 respm Statement of Material Facts Wed 07/31 10:51 AM
Statement of Material Facts regarding28 MOTION for Summary Judgment SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Shawn Good and to Set Distorgement and Prejudgment Interest, But Deem The Amounts Satisfied by the Judgment Against Good in Related Cri filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
29 29 19 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 07/31 10:50 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding28 MOTION for Summary Judgment SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Shawn Good and to Set Distorgement and Prejudgment Interest, But Deem The Amounts Satisfied by the Judgment Against Good in Related Cri minal Case filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Wed 07/31 10:47 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment Against Defendant Shawn Good and to Set Distorgement and Prejudgment Interest, But Deem The Amounts Satisfied by the Judgment Against Good in Related Criminal Case filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment And Entering Final Judgment
Friday, July 15, 2022
27 27 4 pgs order Judgment - Consent Fri 07/15 12:22 PM
ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT SHAWN EDWARD GOOD - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/15/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/15 11:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting25 Motion. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/15/2022. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/15 10:02 AM
MOTION Joint Motion Exemption From Mediation regarding23 Scheduling Order, Joint Motion of the Parties For An Exemption From Mediation [Local ADR Rule 101.1a(e)] filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
24 24 7 pgs misc Settlement Agreement Fri 07/15 9:50 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Defendant Shawn Edward Good To Order of Permanent Injunction And Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 30, 2022
adr Notice to Counsel - Selection of Mediator Thu 06/30 9:52 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 7/21/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
23 23 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 06/30 9:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/17/2023. Motions due by 4/14/2023. The matter will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/29/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
22 22 4 pgs discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Tue 06/21 9:47 AM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
21 21 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Tue 05/17 4:23 PM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/17/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
20 20 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/17 3:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Shawn E. Good. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
19 19 4 pgs order Preliminary Injunction Wed 04/27 10:35 AM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/27/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/27 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Status Conference held on 4/27/2022. Counsel for both parties present. Parties discuss the posture of the case. Court enters the Order of Preliminary Injunction and cancels the hearing scheduled for next week. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Amy Condon) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
17 17 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/26 10:38 AM
Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Loomis, Madison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Shawn E. Good, Order Continuing Freeze of Assets and Other Ancilary Relief
utility Motion Submitted Tue 04/26 11:50 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding17 Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/22 6:03 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion Modify TRO to Permit Living Expenses. The temporary restraining order entered 20 April 2022 is modified to permit Defendant to receive up to $5,000 per month from his mother, Wanda Good, that he may use to pay his living expenses. All other provisions of the temporary restraining order entered at DE-11 on 20 April 2022 remain in effect. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/22/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/22 5:59 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue. It is hearby ORDERED that a status conference in this matter will be held Wednesday, April 27, 2022, at 10:00 AM at the Federal Courthouse in Raleigh, NC. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/22/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/22 6:00 PM
**** Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/21 5:50 PM
MOTION Modify TRO to Permit Living Expenses regarding11 Order on Motion for TRO,, filed by Shawn E. Good. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Continue Thu 04/21 11:46 AM
MOTION to Continue Status Conference set for 26 April 2022 filed by Shawn E. Good. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/21 11:40 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph E. Zeszotarski, Jr on behalf of Shawn E. Good. (Zeszotarski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
11 11 7 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Wed 04/20 2:07 PM
ORDER granting in part8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The court SCHEDULES a status conference on Tuesday, April 26, 2022, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One of the Terry Sanford Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. Pursuant to Rule 65, the court SCHEDULES a hearing on whether the court should issue a preliminary injunction. The hearing will be Tuesday, May 3, 2022, at 2:00 PM. Defendant SHALL file any response in opposition to the entry of a preliminary injunction not later than 8:00 AM on Friday, April 29, 2022. No reply is allowed. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/20/2022. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Selected for Mediation Wed 04/20 11:58 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/20 2:10 PM
**** Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Hearing regarding preliminary injunction set for 5/3/2022 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/19 10:46 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Madison G Loomis on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Loomis, Madison)
Related: [-]
9 9 18 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 04/19 10:26 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding Notice of Deficiency, Notice of Deficiency,,7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, And Other Equitable Relief ,8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze And Other Equitable Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew F. McNamara in Support of SEC's Motion for TRO,
Att: 2 28 pgs Declaration of Caitlin L. Andrews with Exhibits A, B, C and D,
Att: 3 2 pgs Declaration of Beverly H. Andrews,
Att: 4 Declaration of Richard Alan Tharington,
Att: 5 Declaration of William Mills with Exhibits A and B,
Att: 6 2 pgs Declaration of Daniel Bowers,
Att: 7 5 pgs Declaration of Tiffany B. Kunkle,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, Temporary Restraining Order, Order Freezing Assets And For Accounting, Order Prohibiting Destruction of Documents And Order Expediting Discovery
8 8 3 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 04/19 10:15 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze And Other Equitable Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SEC's Rule 65(b) Certification
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 04/19 10:11 AM
REFILED AT [DE #8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, And Other Equitable Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward) Modified on 4/19/2022 to reflect that the motion was refiled at8 . (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/19 9:52 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua C. Hess on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hess, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/19 9:29 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Edward G. Sullivan on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 04/19 8:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Shawn E. Good. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/19 7:50 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-3] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief. The document should have been filed using a motion event. Counsel is directed to refile the document using the proper motion event. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/19 7:57 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-5] Memorandum in Support and attachments. Counsel is directed to refile their Memorandum in Support as separate pleading. Counsel should first file the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction using the motion event. Counsel should then file the Memorandum in Support, using the MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT event located under the Responses and Replies category, linking to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order when prompted to do so. Also each exhibit/attachment should be filed and described as attachments to the Memorandum in Support. See Section V.E.1(b) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/19 8:00 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-14] Notice of Appearance. The Notice of Appearance is a stand alone document therefore Counsel is directed to refile the Notice of Appearance using the event "Other Filings - Notices - Notice of Attorney Appearance". (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 04/19 3:37 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze And Other Equitable Relief . (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/18 11:32 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua C. Hess on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hess, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/18 11:19 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Madison G Loomis on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Loomis, Madison)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/18 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Relief against Shawn E. Good against All Defendants, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief,
Att: 4 SEC's Rule 65(b) Certification,
Att: 5 SEC's Memorandum of Law Supporting TRO and Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 6 Declaration of Matthew McNamara,
Att: 7 28 pgs Declaration of Caitlin Andrews with exhibits,
Att: 8 Declaration of Beverly H. Andrews,
Att: 9 Declaration of Richard Alan Tharington,
Att: 10 4 pgs Declaration of William Mills with exhibits,
Att: 11 Declaration of Daniel Bowers,
Att: 12 Declaration of Tiffany B. Kunkle,
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting TRO, Asset Freeze and Other Relief,
Att: 14 Notice of Appearance of Edward G. Sullivan on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission