Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-21041

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:22-ap-01092
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2022
Terminated:Jan 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Represented By
PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Represented By
Garrick A Hollander
Winthrop Golubow Hollander, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
27 27 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/31 1:15 PM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-1092 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (SB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,,11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
26 26 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 01/03 9:55 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. **FOR FUTURE REFERENCE, INCLUDE THE HEARING INFORMATION IN CAPTION OF ORDER (PAST OR FUTURE STATUS, PRETRIAL OR TRIAL DATE)** Related [+] (SB2)
Related: [-] 24 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Friday, December 30, 2022
25 25 notice Notice Fri 12/30 1:51 PM
Notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:22-ap-01092. Complaint by ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, against PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers of Property and Disallow Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
24 24 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 12/30 1:47 PM
Stipulation By ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, and Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
23 23 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Tue 11/15 5:42 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Trial date set for 1/23/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (SB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
22 22 motion Pre Trial Stipulation (motion) Tue 10/18 4:44 PM
Pre Trial Stipulation By ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, and Joint Pretrial Stipulation and Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
21 21 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10/13 10:41 AM
Notice of lodgment Notice of Lodgment of Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law on Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 7056 Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Summary Judgment Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Eric J. Weissman And Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
20 20 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10/13 10:37 AM
Notice of lodgment Notice of Lodgment of Order Granting Summary Adjudication of Issues Regarding Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Rule 7056 Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Summary Judgment Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Eric J. Weissman And Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
19 19 misc Request for judicial notice Tue 09/20 10:07 PM
Request for judicial notice Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-] 18 Reply
18 18 answer Reply Tue 09/20 10:05 PM
Reply to Related [+] Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-] 17 Opposition filed by Defendant PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
17 17 answer Opposition Tue 09/13 3:33 PM
Opposition to Related [+] with proof of service Filed by Defendant PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Perry Isaacson, Misty)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Summary Judgment Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Eric J. Weissman And Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Att: 1 Declaration of Sarah Hadley
Att: 2 Proposed Statement of Controverted Facts and Conclusions of Law
Friday, August 12, 2022
16 16 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Fri 08/12 7:56 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 10/4/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (WK)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Thursday, August 11, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing (AP Case) Thu 08/11 5:21 PM
Notice of Hearing Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication of Facts and Issues of Law; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Eric J. Weissman and Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Summary Judgment Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Eric J. Weissman And Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
14 14 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 08/11 12:34 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION/HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING DATE OF 10/4/22 @ 2:00PM. Related [+] (WK)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality @ Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Friday, August 05, 2022
13 13 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 08/05 4:31 PM
Notice of lodgment Notice of Lodgment of Plaintiff's [Proposed] Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Summary Judgment Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Eric J. Weissman And Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
12 12 misc Statement Fri 08/05 4:15 PM
Statement Plaintiffs Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment On Complaint To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers Of Property And Disallow Claims Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,. (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Summary Judgment (motion) Fri 08/05 4:13 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment, Partial Adjudication Of Facts And Issues Of Law; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Eric J. Weissman And Garrick A. Hollander In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/29 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 27, 2022
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 06/27 4:32 PM
Status Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/27/2022 Related [+]. (WK)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
8 8 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Tue 06/21 4:39 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (SB2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Friday, June 17, 2022
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 06/17 3:42 PM
Notice of lodgment of Status Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:22-ap-01092. Complaint by ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, against PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers of Property and Disallow Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
6 6 misc Status report Wed 05/25 12:02 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Stockl, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 16, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/16 8:56 AM
Answer to Complaint with proof of service Filed by PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Perry Isaacson, Misty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
4 4 notice Notice Tue 04/19 11:19 AM
Notice Notice of Early Meeting of Counsel Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 Filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, Related [+]. (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:22-ap-01092. Complaint by ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, against PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers of Property and Disallow Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,,2 Summons Issued on PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Date Issued 4/15/2022, Answer Due 5/16/2022 (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,) Status hearing to be held on 6/14/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/19 10:54 AM
Summons Service Executed on PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company 4/18/2022 (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 04/15 4:34 PM
Summons Issued on PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Date Issued 4/15/2022, Answer Due 5/16/2022 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/14/2022 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Kaaumoana, William)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust,
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/15 3:03 PM
Adversary case 2:22-ap-01092. Complaint by ERIC J. WEISSMAN as Trustee of the Vitality Health Plan of California, Inc. Creditor Trust, against PACIFIC HILLS MANOR aka COVENANT CARE MORGAN HILL, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers of Property and Disallow Claims Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hollander, Garrick)
Related: [-]