California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:22-cv-02410
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 15, 2022 3:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Language Line Services, Inc.
Represented By
Joel Paul Kelly
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Oliveira
Represented By
Jerusalem F. Beligan
Kabateck LLP
contact info
Brian Stephen Kabateck
Kabateck LLP
contact info
Shant Arthur Karnikian
Kabateck LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 22 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 56 December 5, 2023 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 1. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2023)
GPO Feb 24 2025
ORDER granting 76 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and granting in part 75 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 2/24/2025.(nmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
85 85 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 04/29 4:01 PM
Declaration of Laura Singh of Settlement Administrator CPT Group, Inc. re Disbursement filed bySharon Oliveira. (Lalehzarian, Sheri)
Related: [-]