Original Case: 1:20-cv-01456

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-usc-11203
Typeu.s. civil / u.s. defendant - non plra
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2022
Terminated:May 27, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 01, 2022 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Conor P. Desmond
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Kari A. Powell
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Robert Joel Branman
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THOMAS M. DEEB
Represented By
Josie Harris-Walton
The Walton Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIE U. BEUG-DEEB
Represented By
Josie Harris-Walton
The Walton Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/01/2022 4:29 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Marie U. Beug-Deeb and Thomas M. Deeb on 04/11/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/23/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/02/2022 as to Appellant Thomas M. Deeb. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/16/2022 as to Appellee United States of America
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 22 pgs Opinion and Order doc#36
Att: 3 1 pgs Clerk's Judgment doc#37
Att: 4 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties