Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Robert R Summerhays
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:22-cv-01027
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2022
Terminated:May 27, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 16, 2022 4:05 AM CDT
Defendant
Dynasty Healthcare Group L L C
Plaintiff
A Quality Staffing L L C
Represented By
Michael L Vincenzo
King & Jurgens (no)
contact info
Henry A King
King & Jurgens
contact info
Dowling Burke Stough
King & Jurgens (no)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 27, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Fri 05/27 2:19 PM
ORDER granting8 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/27/2022. (crt,Taylor, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
8 8 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Thu 05/26 3:57 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by A Quality Staffing L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/26/2022.(aty,Stough, Dowling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/03 11:44 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A Quality Staffing L L C identifying Corporate Parent Southfield Mezzanine Capital LP, Corporate Parent Resolute Capital Partners Fund IV, LP for A Quality Staffing L L C. (aty,King, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/26 4:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by A Quality Staffing L L C. Dynasty Healthcare Group L L C served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (aty,King, Henry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
5 5 service Summons Reissued - All (Form Included) Wed 04/20 4:04 PM
SUMMONS REISSUED as to Dynasty Healthcare Group L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 04/19 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Henry A King on behalf of Quality Staffing L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/3/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Tue 04/19 4:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dynasty Healthcare Group L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons Tue 04/19 1:23 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Dynasty Healthcare Group L.L.C. d/b/a St. Christina Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, submitted by A Quality Staffing LLC d/b/a Elite Medical Staffing. (aty,King, Henry)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/19 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Dynasty Healthcare Group L L C (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5072934) filed by Quality Staffing L L C.(Attorney Henry A King added to party A Quality Staffing LLC d/b/a Elite Medical Staffing(pty:pla))(aty,King, Henry) Modified docket text on 4/19/2022 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/19 4:52 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]