Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Donald C Nugent
Referred: Thomas M Parker
Case #: 1:22-cv-00627
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2022
Terminated:Aug 16, 2023
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:21-cv-08244
Last checked: Sunday Oct 16, 2022 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Gregory A. Thompson
personally P.O. Box #375
Berea, OH 44017
Defendant
Frank Beier
Defendant
Jeffrey Street
Defendant
Treasure Seekers Brutal Truth LLC
Plaintiff
Barbara Andersen
Unit C. 3201 Zafarano Drive Box 259
Santa Fe, NM 87507
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Google LLC
Terminated: 02/03/2022
Represented By
David H. Kramer
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info

GPO Dec 22 2021
ny non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/19/2022.]ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery; denying as moot 11 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed on 12/22/2021. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)A
GPO Mar 31 2022
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED. Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/31/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/19/2022.]
GPO Apr 18 2022
e been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/19/2022.]ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO; DENYING PENDING MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/18/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants hav
GPO Oct 14 2022
Report and Recommendation that Plaintiff Barbara Andersen's motion to voluntarily dismiss party Frank Beier and Jeffery Street (ECF Doc. 72) be GRANTED. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 10/28/2022. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/14/2022. (D,JJ)
GPO Nov 02 2022
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. The Court has carefully reviewed the Report and Recommendation and agrees with the findings set forth therein. The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Parker (ECF #81) is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants Frank Beier and Jeffrey Street (ECF #72) is granted. Defendants Frank Beier and Jeffrey Street are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/2/2022. (M,S)
GPO Nov 23 2022
Report and Recommendation that defendant Gregory A. Thompson's motion to dismiss the amended complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and (5) (ECF Doc. 89) be DENIED for being procedurally improper. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 12/7/2022. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/23/2022. (D,JJ)
GPO Jan 11 2023
Order Adopting 91 Report and Recommendation. Defendant's 89 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/11/2023. (M,S)
GPO Jul 14 2023
Amended Report and Recommendation: Because plaintiff Barbara Andersen's amended complaint fails to state a claim for relief and fails to satisfy the court's jurisdiction, I recommend that the amended complaint (ECF Doc. 69) be DISMISSED. In light of this recommendation, I further recommend that Andersen's motion for default judgment (ECF Doc. 95) be DENIED as moot, and, due to Andersen's abuse of the court system, that she be sanctioned and ordered to pay defendant Gregory Thompson $500.00. Related Doc. 69. Objections to Report and recommendation Due by 7/28/2023. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 7/14/2023. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Emails, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Andersen's Attorney Registration)(L,Br)
GPO Aug 16 2023
Memorandum Opinion. The Report and Recommendation issued by Magistrate Judge Parker (Docket #119) is hereby ADOPTED in its entirety. Ms. Andersen's Amended Complaint (Docket #69) is hereby DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Ms. Andersen's Motion for Default Judgment (Docket #95) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Ms. Andersen is hereby sanctioned for her conduct during this litigation, and ordered to pay Defendant, Gregory Thompson, $500.00. This case is hereby TERMINATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/16/2023. (M,S)
GPO Mar 13 2024
Report and Recommendation that defendant Gregory Thompson's motion for default (ECF Doc. 125) be DENIED as MOOT, plaintiff Barbara Andersen's motion to strike (ECF Doc. 132) be DENIED, and all other prayers for additional relief be DENIED. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 3/27/2024. Referral Terminated. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 3/13/2024. (D,JJ)
GPO Apr 02 2024
Order Adopting 136 Report and Recommendation. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the "Motion for Default" (ECF #125) be DENIED as MOOT, and that all of the other non-relevant "prayers for relief identified in the multitude of subsequent responses be disregarded. (ECF #136, p. 3, PagelD #654). The Report and Recommendation thus also recommends that "Thompson's prayers for additional relief and Anderson's motion to strike (ECF Doc. 132) should be DENIED." (ECF #136, p. 3, PagelD #654). Neither party has since filed any objections to the Magistrate Judge's March 13, 2024 Report and Recommendation (ECF #136); nonetheless, the Court has reviewed de novo the Report and Recommendation, see Ohio Citizen Action v. City of Seven Hills, 35 F. Supp. 2d 575, 577 (N.D. Ohio 1999), and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/2/2024. (M,S)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
137 137 3 pgs minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Tue 04/02 10:48 AM
Order Adopting136 Report and Recommendation. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the "Motion for Default" (ECF #125 ) be DENIED as MOOT, and that all of the other non-relevant "prayers for relief identified in the multitude of subsequent responses be disregarded. (ECF #136 , p. 3, PagelD #654). The Report and Recommendation thus also recommends that "Thompson's prayers for additional relief and Anderson's motion to strike (ECF Doc.132 ) should be DENIED." (ECF #136 , p. 3, PagelD #654). Neither party has since filed any objections to the Magistrate Judge's March 13, 2024 Report and Recommendation (ECF #136 ); nonetheless, the Court has reviewed de novo the Report and Recommendation, see Ohio Citizen Action v. City of Seven Hills, 35 F. Supp. 2d 575, 577 (N.D. Ohio 1999), and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/2/2024. (M,S)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 04/02 10:50 AM
Copy of137 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, mailed to Gregory A. Thompson P.O. Box #375 Berea, OH 44017 on 4/2/2024. Related document(s)137 . (M,S)
Related: [-]