Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:22-cv-10838
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2022
Terminated:Jan 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 16, 2022 5:40 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
John B. Los
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Gordon James Kangas
contact info
Thomas P. Van Dusen
Bodman
contact info
Counter Claimant
Special E-Systems
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Specialty Systems
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
United Resin, Inc.
Represented By
James K. O'Brien
Dean & Fulkerson
contact info
Robert R. Cleary
Dean & Fulkerson, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey L. Hudson
Dean & Fulkerson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Linda Lenk
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Gordon James Kangas
contact info
Thomas P. Van Dusen
Bodman
contact info
Defendant
John B. Los
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Gordon James Kangas
contact info
Thomas P. Van Dusen
Bodman
contact info
Defendant
Specialty Systems
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Defendant
Special E-Systems
Represented By
Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Bodman PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United Resin, Inc.
Represented By
James K. O'Brien
Dean & Fulkerson
contact info
Robert R. Cleary
Dean & Fulkerson, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey L. Hudson
Dean & Fulkerson, P.C.
contact info

GPO Nov 16 2022
OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 13, 2023
32 32 22 pgs trial Exhibit Mon 03/13 12:13 PM
EXHIBIT re31 Stipulated Order of Injunction by All Parties. (DPar)
Related: [-]
31 31 7 pgs order Stipulation and Order Mon 03/13 9:57 AM
STIPULATED ORDER of Permanent Injunction and Dismissing Case with Prejudice re30 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Dismissing Case Fri 01/27 11:07 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice, ( Closing Documents due by 2/28/2023 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
29 29 11 pgs order Protective Order Fri 01/20 3:34 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
28 28 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/15 9:02 AM
ORDER Referring Case to Mediation. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
27 27 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/14 12:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/30/2023 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/1/2023 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Bench Trial set for 1/23/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. Related [+] (DPar)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 12/14 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 12/14/2022. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (DPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
26 26 19 pgs misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 12/07 3:16 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
25 25 19 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 11/16 11:04 AM
OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
24 24 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/16 10:51 AM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference via Zoom, ( Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
23 23 2 pgs misc Attorney Appearance Mon 10/31 1:58 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily Cross appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Cross, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
22 22 9 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/17 3:01 PM
REPLY to Response re18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Rheaume, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
21 21 1 pgs notice Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument* Wed 10/05 2:19 PM
Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re18 MOTION to Dismiss. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
20 20 35 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 10/03 3:15 PM
RESPONSE to18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Franks v. Franks,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Temborius v. Slatkin,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Lintech v. CAN Softtech
19 19 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 10/03 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiffs. (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
18 18 31 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 09/12 2:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Rheaume, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 127 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Civil Case - Counterclaim Mon 09/12 2:05 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Specialty Systems, Special E-Systems, John B. Los against United Resin, Inc. by Specialty Systems, Special E-Systems, John B. Los. (Rheaume, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 08/23 9:12 AM
ORDER Finding as Moot12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
15 15 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 08/22 4:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by United Resin, Inc. against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Employment Agr Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 2 - J Los Dep Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 3 - J Los Employment Agr,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 4 - Employee Handbook,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 5 - Groen & Kluka Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 6 - EEOC Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 7 -- Defs' Answer to Plf's First Interrogatory,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex 8 - Affidavit of J. Stott Matthews,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex 9 - 1-19-21 Ltr from W Cook to J Los,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit Ex 10 - 4-15-21 Ltr from W Cook to J. Los,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex 11 - J Los e-mail to Esther dated 6-29-21,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex 12 - D&F ltr of 5-7-21,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex 13 - 5-9-21 J Los Note,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex 14 - Change of Control Agr,
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex 15 - Acknowledgment of Relationship & Agr,
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex 16 - John Los' Badge,
Att: 18 Exhibit Ex 17 - J Los' salary, bonuses and benefits
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
14 14 21 pgs order Preliminary Injunction Tue 08/09 9:47 AM
STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Tue 08/09 9:36 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Setting Deadline for Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint re1 Complaint, ( Amended Complaint due by 8/22/2022 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
12 12 28 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 07/18 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Rheaume, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Answer - Free Mon 07/18 3:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, by John B. Los, Special E-Systems, Specialty Systems. (Rheaume, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
10 10 2 pgs notice Appearance Fri 05/20 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Van Dusen on behalf of Linda Lenk, John B. Los. (Van Dusen, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs notice Appearance Fri 05/20 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Linda Lenk, John B. Los. (Rheaume, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs notice Appearance Fri 05/20 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon James Kangas on behalf of Linda Lenk, John B. Los. (Kangas, Gordon)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
7 7 9 pgs motion Expedite Fri 04/22 9:35 AM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by United Resin, Inc.. (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 23 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/22 9:33 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by United Resin, Inc.. (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Chris Prather,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Unreported Cases
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued* Wed 04/20 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Special E-Systems* (NAhm)
Related: [-]
4 4 6 pgs service Summons Issued* Wed 04/20 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Linda Lenk, John B. Los, Specialty Systems* (NAhm)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Attorney Appearance Wed 04/20 1:47 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert R. Cleary appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cleary, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 04/20 10:43 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey L. Hudson appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hudson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
notice Error Wed 04/20 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: James K. O'Brien re1 Complaint,,,,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. [DEFENDANT: SPECIAL E-SYSTEMS] The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
misc Addition of Parties Wed 04/20 3:53 PM
Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Special E-Systems. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing1 Complaint,,,,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
1 1 89 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 04/19 8:33 PM
COMPLAINT filed by United Resin, Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8879869 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (O'Brien, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Index of Exhibits Index,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit Employment Agreement forms,
Att: 3 Index of Exhibits Employee Handbook confidentiality provisions,
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit John Los Deposition Transcript of May 28, 2008,
Att: 5 12 pgs Exhibit Groen & Kluka Report,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 7 22 pgs Exhibit Affidavit of J. Stott Matthews of Spectrum Computer Forensics and Risk Management LLC,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit January 19, 2021 Letter from Wes Cook to John Los,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit April 15, 2021 Letter from Wes Cook to John Los,
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit John Los e-mail to Esther dated June 29, 2021,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit May 9, 2021 John Los Note,
Att: 12 3 pgs Exhibit Change of Control Agreement,
Att: 13 3 pgs Exhibit Acknowledgment of Relationship & Agreement,
Att: 14 3 pgs Exhibit John Los Badge,
Att: 15 2 pgs Exhibit John Los salary, bonuses and benefits,
Att: 16 3 pgs Exhibit Dean & Fulkerson letter of May 7, 2021