Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:22-cv-01492
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2022
Terminated:Nov 22, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 15, 2022 6:28 AM EDT
Defendant
230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC
250 S. Penn Street
Allentown, PA 18102
Represented By
Martin W. Aron, I
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
COLLEEN HECKMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS
Represented By
Martin W. Aron, I
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
COLLEEN HECKMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CASTLE CLUB LLC
254 West Trenton Avenue
Morrisville, PA 19067
Represented By
Martin W. Aron, I
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
COLLEEN HECKMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
EMESS MANAGEMENT
Represented By
Martin W. Aron, I
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
COLLEEN HECKMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOE UNKNOWN
Represented By
Martin W. Aron, I
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
COLLEEN HECKMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
STEPHANIE UNKNOWN, PA
Represented By
Martin W. Aron, I
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
COLLEEN HECKMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM UNKNOWN, PA
Plaintiff
DAVID SABO
850 Bear Tavern Road, Suite 106 Suite 106
Ewing, NJ 08628
Represented By
MARC W. GARBAR
Brandon J. Broderick, Attorney At Law
contact info
CHRISTOPHER A. BRADLEY
Brandon J. Broderick, Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
45 45 motion Withdraw Wed 04/05 10:53 AM
MOTION to Withdraw to Enforce Settlement filed by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN..(HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
44 44 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/03 1:37 PM
ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN APRIL 3, 2023, EITHER: (1) DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A PRAECIPE WITHDRAWING ITS MOTION, OR (2) PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION. IF THE MOTION IS NOT WITHDRAWN AND PLAINTIFF FAILS TO TIMELY RESPOND, THE MOTION MAY BE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 3/3/23. 3/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
43 43 misc Letter Thu 03/02 4:11 PM
Letter dated 3/2/2023 by DAVID SABO. (GARBAR, MARC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
42 42 motion Settlement Tue 02/21 6:34 PM
MOTION for Settlement filed by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN.Memorandum.(Aron, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Colleen Heckman,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 11/22 1:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON NOVEMBER 22, 2022. 11/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dja)
Related: [-]
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 11/22 10:35 AM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT39 MOTION OF PLAINTIFF AND THE EMESS DEFENDANTS IS HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SETTLEMENT WITH RESPECT TO THE FLSA CLAIMS IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/22/22.11/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
39 39 motion Settlement Mon 11/21 4:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC.Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement.(HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law with COS and Ex. A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 14, 2022
38 38 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/14 2:12 PM
ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE MONDAY, NOVEMBER 21, 2022, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/14/22. 11/14/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
37 37 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 10/12 2:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. Settlement Conference held on 10/12/22. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/08 10:37 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/12/2022 09:30 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 9/7/22. 9/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
35 35 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 09/07 4:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. Pretrial Conference held on 9/7/22. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
misc Remark Fri 08/19 5:28 PM
Copy of Doc. 31 mailed to Counsel. (mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
34 34 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 08/18 12:30 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/7/2022 02:30 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 8/18/22. 8/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
33 33 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 08/17 4:18 PM
ORDER THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER NOVEMBER 14, 2022. IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/17/22. 8/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
32 32 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 08/17 4:15 PM
ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/1/2023 04:00 PM IN Cahn 3C BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR. DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/14/2022; MOTIONS DUE BY 11/14/2022, TRIAL DATE SET FOR 2/6/2023 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/17/22. 8/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 08/17 6:46 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARTIN W. ARON, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COMIPURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/16/22. 8/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL) AND E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/16 3:53 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martin W. Aron, Esquire by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16112409.). (HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 08/16 2:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR: Pretrial Conference held on 8/16/22. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/10 3:43 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, ECF NO. 26, IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT TO BE REFILED ON THE COURT'S FORM APPLICATION, ALONG WITH PAYMENT OF THE REQUIRED FEE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/10/22.8/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Report Of Wed 08/10 11:38 AM
Report Of Joint Report to Court of Rule 26(f) Meeting by EMESS MANAGEMENT. (HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/29 4:36 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN.Affidavit.(HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Martin W. Aron,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Colleen S. Heckman,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission
Thursday, July 28, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 07/28 4:59 PM
NOTICE SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, AUGUST 16, 2022, AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
24 24 misc Statement Fri 07/15 4:04 PM
Statement 7.1 Disclosure by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN. (HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 07/15 3:55 PM
ANSWER to2 Amended Complaint by 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN.(HECKMAN, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/22 3:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SABO. STEPHANIE UNKNOWN waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/22 3:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SABO. JOE UNKNOWN waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/22 3:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SABO. EMESS MANAGEMENT waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/22 3:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SABO. CASTLE CLUB LLC waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/22 3:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SABO. CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/22 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SABO. 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC waiver sent on 5/16/2022, answer due 7/15/2022. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/22 10:45 AM
DEFAULT NOTICE: 10 Day Notice Failure of Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (er)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/22 10:43 AM
NOTICE: No Proof of Service on Docket (er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/28 10:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Alan Focht re: served Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint Personal Service upon 230 Riverbend Apartments, LLC d/b/a Emess Management by Personal on 04/25/2022 (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/28 10:55 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Alan Focht re: served Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint Personal Service upon Emess Management by Personal on 04/25/2022 (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/28 10:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint Personal Service upon Stephanie Unknown by Personal on 04/26/2022 (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/28 10:50 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint Personal Service upon Joe Unknown by Personal on 04/26/2022 (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/28 10:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint Personal Service upon Castle Club LLC by Personal on 04/26/2022 (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/28 10:48 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint Personal Service upon Castle Club Apartments by Personal on 04/26/2022 (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 04/21 7:31 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MARC W. GARBAR FOR PLAINTIFF DAVID SABO IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/21/22. 4/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint) Thu 04/21 11:51 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by DAVID SABO. Amendment to6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card) Marc W. Garbar, Esq. for Plaintiff . (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 04/21 11:40 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice For Plaintiff of Marc W. Garbar, Esq. by DAVID SABO. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15870992.). (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/20 5:27 PM
Summons Issued as to 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, CASTLE CLUB LLC, EMESS MANAGEMENT, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN, WILLIAM UNKNOWN. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/19/22 (mas)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/19 3:58 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/19/22. 4/19/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Exhibit Tue 04/19 12:38 PM
EXHIBIT Designation Form by DAVID SABO.. (BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 04/19 9:49 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Completed Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
2 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 230 RIVERBEND APARTMENTS LLC, JOE UNKNOWN, STEPHANIE UNKNOWN, WILLIAM UNKNOWN, Emess Management, CASTLE CLUB LLC, CASTLE CLUB APARTMENTS, filed by DAVID SABO.(BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT DAVID SABO against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15864028.), filed by DAVID SABO.(BRADLEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form