PEARSON v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-05394 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00804 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 17, 2022 5:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN JOHN PEARSON, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Sunday, May 01, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand - per PTO 17 against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETLY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, filed by Steven Pearson. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of Steven Pearson (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER - PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 5/10/2022 .) (djb) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00804. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Bryan F. Aylstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/20/2022.] | |
5 | 5 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/20/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-804 (JRT/TNL). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/20/2022.] | |
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |