South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Case #: 3:22-cv-01273
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2022
Terminated:Jan 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 16, 2022 4:21 AM EDT
Carrier
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Virginia Patterson Bozeman
Turner Padget Graham And Laney (col)
contact info
Defendant
Jahmaine Martez Fomby
Represented By
Virginia Patterson Bozeman
Turner Padget Graham And Laney (col)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lucas A. Moore
Represented By
Robert Fredrick Goings
Goings Law Firm LLC
contact info
Jessica Lee Gooding
Goings Law Firm LLC
contact info
Christopher Mark Paschal
Goings Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
17 17 misc Document E-Mailed Wed 01/11 9:50 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED16 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, to Jeanette W. McBride, Richland County Clerk of Court (ahil)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 01/11 9:26 AM
OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case was improperly removed, and the matter is REMANDED to the state court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on January 11, 2023.(ahil)
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Wed 01/11 9:52 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED16 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jeanette W. McBride Richland County Clerk of Court PO Box 2766 Columbia, SC 29202-2766. (ahil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/07 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 13 Consent Motion to Stay Pending Deadlines Subject to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. In the Consent Motion [ECF No. 13], the parties assert staying all pending deadlines aside from those related to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Remand (ECF No. 7) will serve the interest of judicial economy because if the Court decides it does not have jurisdiction, the scheduling order will be moot as the case will be remanded to the state court. (ECF No. 13.) Local Civil Rule 16.00(C) (D.S.C.) allows the Court to stay proceedings pending resolution of a motion to remand. Local Civ. R. 16.00(C) (D.S.C.) ("The court may stay entry of the scheduling order(s) and all federal and local civil rule disclosure and conference requirements pending resolution of a motion to remand or to dismiss or other dispositive motion."). Further, the Court finds staying this action pending its decision on Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Remand (ECF No. 7) will serve interests of judicial economy and will conserve the respective parties' and their counsel's time and resources. See Air Line Pilots Ass'n v. Miller, 523 U.S. 866, 879 n.6 (1998) ("[T]he power to stay proceedings is incidental to the power in every court to control the disposition of the causes on its docket with economy of time and effort for itself, for counsel, and for litigants.") (quoting Landis v. N. Am. Co., 299 U.S. 248, 254-55 (1936)); United States v. Ga. Pac. Corp., 562 F.2d 294, 296 (4th Cir. 1977) (stating whether a federal district court should grant or deny a motion to stay "calls for an exercise of judgment to balance the various factors relevant to the expeditious and comprehensive disposition of the causes of action on the courts docket.") (citing Landis, 299 U.S. at 254). Accordingly, the Consent Motion to Stay Pending Deadlines Subject to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No. 13] is granted. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on July 7, 2022.(ahil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
13 13 motion Stay Wed 06/22 9:03 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay re12 Scheduling Order, by Lucas A. Moore. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Goings, Robert) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/22/2022) (ahil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/21 2:24 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/11/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/25/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/6/2022, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 9/29/2022, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/31/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/18/2022, Discovery due by 12/19/2022, Motion in Limine due by 2/16/2023, Motions due by 1/3/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/27/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/6/2023, Mediation Due by 1/17/2023, Signed by the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on June 21, 2022. (ahil)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/23 11:20 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Lucas A. Moore.(Goings, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service
Monday, May 16, 2022
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/16 8:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/23/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bozeman, Virginia)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Mon 05/02 4:31 PM
Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lucas A. Moore. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Goings, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's 8.9.21 Demand,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Past Medical Expenses Summary,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 8.9.21 Email to Liberty Mutual with Demand,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Electronic Transfer Download Info
Thursday, April 28, 2022
6 6 notice Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal Thu 04/28 3:14 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County.(Bozeman, Virginia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal
Thursday, April 21, 2022
5 5 motion Remand to State Court Thu 04/21 5:43 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lucas A. Moore. Response to Motion due by 5/5/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Goings, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's demand letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Past Medical Expenses Summary,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-8.9.21 Email to Liberty Mutual,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-electronic transfer confirmation
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 04/20 12:11 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jahmaine Martez Fomby.(ahil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/20 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Clerk of Court, case number 2021-CP 40-5044 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10450939), filed by Jahmaine Martez Fomby.(ahil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, UM Carrier,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Lucas Moore Past Medical Expenses,
Att: 3 State Court Documents Richland County Common Pleas; 2021-cp-40-05044