Boe et al v. Marshall et al
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Liles C Burke |
Referred: | Chad W Bryan |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00184 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 16, 2022 3:56 AM CDT |
Amicus
Academic Pediatric Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Alabama Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Academy of Family Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Academy of Nursing
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Association of Physicians for Human Rights, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American College of Osteopathic Pediatricians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American College of Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Medical Association
515 North State St.
Chicago, IL 60610 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Pediatric Society
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Psychiatric Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Association of American Medical Colleges
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Pediatric Endocrine Society
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Societies for Pediatric Urology
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Society for Pediatric Research
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Society of Pediatric Nurses
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Alaska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Arkansas
Office of the Attorney General 323 Center Street Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Louisiana
Office of the Attorney General P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Montana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Nebraska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of South Carolina
Office of the Attorney General P.O. Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Texas
Attorney General Office P.O. Box 12017
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of West Virginia
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General State Capital, Bldg 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Endocrine Society
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
World Professional Association for Transgender Health
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Caroline M. Aderholt
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Robert B. Aderholt
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
America First Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Family Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Americans United for Life
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mo Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Chip Brown
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Cardinal Institute for West Virginia Policy
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jerry L. Carl
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Center for Arizona Policy
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Center for Family and Human Rights
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Citizens United
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Citizens United Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Concerned Women for America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
T. Christopher Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Faith & Freedom Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Foundation for Moral Law
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Free Speech Coalition et al
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Frontline Policy Council
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Independent Women's Forum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Locke Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Judicial Watch, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Louisiana Family Forum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Manhattan Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Allen Mendenhall
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Michigan Family Forum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Arnold Mooney
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Barry Moore
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mountain States Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Republican Redistricting Trust
2308 Mount Vernon Avenue No. 725
Alexandria, VA 22301 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Oklahoma Council of Public Affairs
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Gary Palmer
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Parental Rights Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Pennsylvania Family Council
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Private Citizen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Protect Our Kids
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Public Interest Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mike Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Matt Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Susan B. Anthony Pro-Life America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tea Party Patriots Action, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tea Party Patriots Foundation, Inc.
1025 Rose Creek Drive Suite 620-322
Woodstock, GA 30189 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tennessee Eagle Forum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Texas Public Policy Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Buckeye Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Commonwealth Foundation for Public Policy Alternative
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Family Action Council of Tennessee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Foundation for Government Accountability
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Liberty Justice Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The National Right to Work Committee
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Religious RoundTable, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Hans Von Spakovsky
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tim R. Wadsworth
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
J.T. Waggoner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tom Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daryl D. Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C. Wilson Baylock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danny Carr
in his official capacity as District Attorney for Jefferson County 801 Richard Arrington, Jr. Blvd N Suite 105
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessica Ventiere
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Eagle Forum of Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Southeast Law Institute
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brianna Boe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Koe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Noe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Poe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Austin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Moe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Roe
individually and on behalf of her minor daughter, MELISSA ROE 400 20th Street North
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kay Ivey
Terminated: 05/05/2022
Montgomery, AL 36130
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul A. Eknes-Tucker
Terminated: 09/19/2022
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Moe
Terminated: 09/19/2022
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Zoe
Terminated: 09/19/2022
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Voe
Terminated: 09/19/2022
400 20th Street North
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
475 | 475
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 1:36 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number AALMDC-3627305.) by Steve Marshall. (Broyles, Vernadette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
474 | 474
6
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 04/18 4:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal or Rachel Koe and Kathy Noe] by Heather Austin, Brianna Boe, Rachel Koe, Robert Moe, Kathy Noe, Megan Poe, Rebecca Roe. (Ray, Brent) |
|
473 | 473
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 1:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motions for admission pro hac vice as to Philip A. Sechler (Doc. 470 ), Christopher F. Stoll (Doc. 471 ), and Amy Whelan (Doc. 472 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Liles C. Burke on 04/18/24. (no pdf attached) (GGN) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
472 | 472
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 5:57 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number AALMDC-3625895.) by Heather Austin, Brianna Boe, Paul A. Eknes-Tucker, Jane Moe, Robert Moe, Kathy Noe, Megan Poe, Rebecca Roe, Robert Voe, James Zoe. (Vague, Amie) |
|
471 | 471
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 5:54 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number AALMDC-3625894.) by Heather Austin, Brianna Boe, Paul A. Eknes-Tucker, Robert Moe, Kathy Noe, Megan Poe, Rebecca Roe, Robert Voe, James Zoe. (Vague, Amie) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 04/18 10:45 AM
***PURSUANT TO THE471 MOTION - Attorney Christopher Francis Stoll for Heather Austin, Brianna Boe, Rachel Koe, Robert Moe, Kathy Noe, Megan Poe, and Rebecca Roe added. (no pdf attached) (GGN) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 04/18 10:56 AM
***PURSUANT TO THE472 MOTION - Attorney Amy Elizabeth Whelan for Heather Austin, Brianna Boe, Rachel Koe, Robert Moe, Kathy Noe, Megan Poe, and Rebecca Roe added. (no pdf attached) (GGN) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
470 | 470
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 2:14 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of PHILIP A. SECHLER ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number AALMDC-3625082.) by Tom Anderson, Daryl D. Bailey, C. Wilson Baylock, Danny Carr, Steve Marshall, Jessica Ventiere. (Bowdre, Alexander) (Main Document 470 replaced to add city on 4/16/2024) (GGN). Modified on 4/16/2024 to add Philip A. Sechler (GGN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 04/18 10:18 AM
***PURSUANT TO THE470 MOTION - Attorney Philip Andrew Sechler for Daryl D. Bailey, Danny Carr, Steve Marshall, and Jessica Ventiere added. (No pdf attached) (WCL) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
469 | 469
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion for Sanctions
Mon 04/15 4:27 PM
ORDER: the Court ADOPTS the Private Plaintiffs' agreement with non-parties Eagle Forum of Alabama and Alabama Citizens Action Program and GRANTS both non-parties' motions (Docs. 402 & 407 ). Private Plaintiffs are therefore ORDERED to pay $25,000 to Eagle Forum of Alabama and $5,000 to Alabama Citizen's Action Program by May 3, 2024, if they have not done so already. Signed by Honorable Judge Liles C. Burke on 04/15/24. (GGN) |