Original Case: 2:21-cv-00061

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-stp-10830
Typeprivate civil - prisoner / civil rights plra - not applic
Nature of Suit560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2022
Terminated:Apr 14, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Apr 21, 2022 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ADMINISTRATIVE DIRECTOR (FCCC)
Defendant - Appellee
ASSISTANT TO CLINICAL DIRECTOR (FCCC)
Defendant - Appellee
DIRECTOR OF MENTAL HEALTH (FCCC)
Defendant - Appellee
CLINICAL TEAM LEADER
Defendant - Appellee
EMPLOYEE/LIBRARY STAFF/RECREATION THERAPIST
Defendant - Appellee
M. JOHNSON
Defendant - Appellee
GEO CARE GROUP, INC.
Defendant - Appellee
FCCC GRIEVANCE EXAMINER
Defendant - Appellee
SEXUALLY VIOLENT PREDATOR PROGRAM DIRECTORS
Defendant - Appellee
BILLING, COCHRAN, LYLES, MAURO & RAMSEY, P.A.
Defendant - Appellee
DCF
Defendant - Appellee
WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS
Plaintiff - Appellant
RAYVON BOATMAN
Represented By
Rayvon Boatman
Florida CCC - Inmate Legal Mail
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2022 4:29 AM EDT
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Rayvon Boatman on 03/11/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/07/2022 as to Appellant Rayvon Boatman
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 9 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 2 pgs DE #17 Opinion and Order