Fan v. Grab Holdings Limited et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Rochon |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-03277 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 18, 2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Grab Holdings Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Oey
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Tan
|
|
Plaintiff
Si Fan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 1/13/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-JLR, 1:22-cv-03277-JLR.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
22 | 22
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 1/13/2025 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2025.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-JLR, 1:22-cv-03277-JLR.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Brian P. O'Connell dated 12/30/2024 re: Stipulation of Settlement. Document filed by Si Fan, Amit Batra, SLG Cloudbank Holdings, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-JLR, 1:22-cv-03277-JLR.(O'Connell, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ORAL ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/7/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-JLR, 1:22-cv-03277-JLR.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
19 | 19
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 3/7/2024 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharonda Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2024.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-JLR, 1:22-cv-03277-JLR.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Mon 02/19 12:11 PM
ORDER. The Court will hold oral argument on the pending motion on March 1, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (sew) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from All Parties dated October 10, 2022 re: Status of Case. Document filed by Ng Shin Ein, Grab Holdings Limited, Oliver Jay, Dara Khosrowshahi, Tan Hooi Ling, Maa Ming-Hokng, Peter Oey, John Rogers, Anthony Tan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-JLR, 1:22-cv-03277-JLR.(Saltzstein, Susan) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: his case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jennifer-l-rochon. Any conference or oral argument before or directed by the Magistrate Judge will proceed as ordered. However, all previously-scheduled appearances or conferences before the District Judge are hereby adjourned pending further notice from the Court. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 9/26/2022) (ate) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 09/23 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Victor Marrero is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (40) MOTION for David A. Rosenfeld to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, and for good cause shown, it is HEREBY ORDERED THAT David A. Rosenfeld of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the above-named attorney and law firm from the docket as well as the ECF Service List. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney David Avi Rosenfeld terminated in case 1:22-cv-02189-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/13/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-02189-VM, 1:22-cv-03277-VM (jca) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND CO-LEAD COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. The above-captioned actions are consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42 under the caption In re Grab Holdings Limited Securities Litigation, Case No. 1:22-cv-02189; 2. SLG and Fan/Batra are hereby appointed Co-Lead Plaintiffs in this Action and any subsequently filed or transferred actions that are consolidated with this Action, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. §78u-4(a)(3)(B); and 3. Co-Lead Plaintiffs' selections of Levi & Korsinsky and Pomerantz as Co-Lead Counsel are hereby approved. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/2022) (jca) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER granting [24 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint; denying [25 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying [25 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint; denying [25 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying [10 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying [10 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint; denying [10 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying [13 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint; denying [13 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying [13 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying [17 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying [17 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint; denying [17 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying [19 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying [19 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Appoint; denying [19 in 1:22-cv-02189-VM] Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk of Court is respectfully ordered to consolidate the cases for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The cases shall be consolidated under Case No. 22-cv-2189. A Master File is hereby established under that case number. All pending motions with the exception of the Proposed Stipulation and Order (Dkt. No. 37) are DENIED. The co-lead plaintiffs Si Fan, Amit Batra, and SLG Cloudbank Holdings must comply with all of the Court's standard methods and practices for effectuating service of process. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/7/2022) (jca) |
|
utility
Case Consolidation - Member
Tue 06/07 5:44 PM
CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:22-cv-02189-VM.. (jca) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING PLEADING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, and subject to Court approval, in order to avoid the unnecessary expenditure of efforts by the parties and the Court prior to the appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and the filing or designation of an Amended Complaint, that: 1. None of the Defendants shall have any obligation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaints until a schedule has been proposed and adopted by the Court following appointment of lead plaintiff in accordance with this Stipulation. 2. Within fourteen (14) days of appointment of a lead plaintiff, the parties shall file a proposed scheduling order with respect to the timing of any Amended Complaint and briefing with respect to a potential motion (or motions) to dismiss the Amended Complaint, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices. 3. By executing this stipulation, the undersigned do not waive any defenses, and all such defenses are expressly reserved. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to curtail any rights under the Federal Rules that might otherwise exist absent this agreement. 4. Nothing in this stipulation shall prejudice the right of any party to seek further extensions on the consent of the other parties or from the Court. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/10/2022) (jca) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Susan L. Saltzstein dated May 9, 2022 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order. Document filed by Grab Holdings Limited..(Saltzstein, Susan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent, Other Affiliate Uber Technologies, Inc. for Grab Holdings Limited. Document filed by Grab Holdings Limited..(Saltzstein, Susan) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Geier on behalf of Grab Holdings Limited..(Geier, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Leslie Saltzstein on behalf of Grab Holdings Limited..(Saltzstein, Susan) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Henry Przybylowski on behalf of Si Fan..(Przybylowski, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Si Fan..(Hood, Joseph) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Mon 04/25 8:35 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-02189-VM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 04/25 8:37 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Victor Marrero. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/25 8:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (aea) |
||
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grab Holdings Limited, Peter Oey, Anthony Tan. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/22 12:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney eremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Si Fan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/22 12:47 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/22 12:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Fri 04/22 12:47 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Victor Marrero as possibly related to 1:22-cv-02189. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-02189. Document filed by Si Fan..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Grab Holdings Limited, Anthony Tan, and Peter Oey, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Si Fan..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Grab Holdings Limited, Peter Oey, Anthony Tan. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26041996)Document filed by Si Fan..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |