USA v. Buford
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 9:22-cr-80060 |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 22, 2022 3:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Raymond Lee Buford (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2022 5:57 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (spe) [9:22-mj-08148-RMM] | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raymond Lee Buford - Initial Appearance set for 4/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before WPB Duty Magistrate. (spe) [9:22-mj-08148-RMM] | |
4 | 4 PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe: Initial Appearance as to Raymond Lee Buford held on 4/13/2022. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 4/13/2022. Defendant present and sworn. Court advised defendant of charges, maximum penalties and rights. Defendant questioned regarding appointment of counsel and found to be indigent. FPD appointed. Government requested pre-trial detention and one day to prepare; defendant requested five days to prepare. Defendant advised of Brady rights under the Due Process Protection Act. Total time in court: 12 minutes. Preliminary/Arraignment set for 4/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before WPB Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 4/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before WPB Duty Magistrate. Attorney Appearance(s): Brian Ralston (AUSA); Robert Adler (AFPD). Attorney added: Noticing FPD-WPB for Raymond Lee Buford (Digital 11:22:33) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/13/2022. (spe) [9:22-mj-08148-RMM] | |
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
12 | 12 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Detention Hearing as to Raymond Lee Buford held on 4/20/2022. Defendant was present with counsel. The Court took judicial notice of the facts contained within the PTS and Criminal Complaint. Government proffer. Witness DEA TFO Rey Paniagua - sworn/testified. Argument from the parties. The Court denied the Government's request for detention. The Court reserved on setting specific bond conditions until defense counsel proposes someone who could be a cosigner on the bond and a place where the defendant could live. Defendant will not be released pending further evidence being offered by defense. Defense counsel may contact the Court when they are ready to proceed with further evidence. Total time in court: 27 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Brian Ralston, Kristy Militello (Digital 10:21:16) (tmn) [9:22-mj-08148-RMM] | |
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |