Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William E Duffin
Case #: 2:22-cv-00495
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2022
Terminated:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2022 4:00 AM CDT
Defendant
United Parcel Service Inc
Represented By
Harrison M Smith
Schmoyer Reinhard LLP
contact info
Warren E Buliox
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Shakia R Smith
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Stribling
Represented By
Janet L Heins
Heins Employment Law Practice LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
65 65 minutes Status Conference Wed 12/18 3:04 PM
Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/17/2024 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Based on everything the court has heard today, court concludes this case has been settled. (Tape #3:30-3:55) (mlm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/12 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/17/2024 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the courts conference line at 669-254-5252. When prompted, use meeting ID 160 9647 6949# and # again and then enter passcode 943682#. Plaintiff to be on the conference call. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
64 64 misc Letter Thu 12/12 8:12 AM
LETTER from Brian Stribling indicating he did not agree to the settlement and would like to go to trial. (mlm)
Related: [-]