California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:22-cv-02709
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2022
Terminated:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2022 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Leigh Lawton
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Christopher Shawn Lavin
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Dargaye Habte Churnet
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Ravi R. Ranganath
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
J. David Hadden
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Saina S. Shamilov
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Jeffrey A. Ware
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Olivia L. Wheeling
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Patrick Ohryn Doyle
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ceiva Opco, LLC
Represented By
Gary Alan Hecker
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Jordan C. Strauss
Muck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Nicole Kamish
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Samuel W. Dunwoody, IV
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
185 185 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 04/17 4:27 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Lee Svendsen counsel for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. Adding Christopher L. Svendsen as counsel of record for Amazon.com, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher Lee Svendsen added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Svendsen, Christopher)
Related: [-]