California Central District Court
Case #: 8:22-mj-00285
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2022
Terminated:Apr 21, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 23, 2022 12:29 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jeremy David Hanson (1)
Terminated: 04/21/2022
Represented By
Jason Hannan
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2022 1:07 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Jeremy David Hanson, originating in the Eastern District of California. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:875(c). Signed by agent Kristren Brown, FBI, Special Agent. filed by Plaintiff USA. (cio)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Jeremy David Hanson; defendants Year of Birth: 1988; date of arrest: 4/20/2022 (cio)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED Defendant Jeremy David Hanson arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Eastern District of Texas at Sherman.(cio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Out-of-District Complaint
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jeremy David Hanson (cio)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF denying4 REQUEST for Detention as to Jeremy David Hanson (1); ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge John D. Early as to Defendant Jeremy David Hanson. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order).Contested detention hearing held. Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Jason Hannan for Jeremy David Hanson, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders bail set as: Jeremy David Hanson (1) $25,000 Appearance Bond, (SEE BOND ATTACHED). Court orders defendant held to answer to Eastern District of Texas. Bond to Transfer. Defendant ordered to report on May 19, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson. U.S. Courthouse, 7940 Preston Road, Suite 110, Plano, Texas 75024. RELEASE ORDER NO: 40939. Defendant reserves the right to have a Preliminary Hearing in the prosecuting district. Court Smart: CS 04/20/2022. (cio)
Related: [-]
6 6 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Jeremy David Hanson. (cio)
Related: [-]
7 7 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Jeremy David Hanson, declaring that I have never been issued any passport or other travel document by any country. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (cio)
Related: [-]
8 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Jeremy David Hanson. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (cio)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge John D. Early as to Defendant Jeremy David Hanson. (cio)
Related: [-]
10 10 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $25,000 by surety: Lauren K. Zack for Filed by Defendant Jeremy David Hanson (cio)
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED UNREDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETY (NO JUSTIFICATION) filed by Defendant Jeremy David Hanson re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)10 (cio)
Related: [-]
12 12 Affidavit of Third-Party Custodian, Lauren Zack agrees to supervise defendant Jeremy Hason. (cio)
Related: [-]
13 13 BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Jeremy David Hanson conditions of release: $25,000 Appearance Bond (SEE BOND ATTACHED) (SEE BOND ATTACHED) approved by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (cio)
Related: [-]