Member Case
Lead case is: 1:22-bk-10375

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:22-bk-10378
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2022

Debtor
Hamon Deltak, Inc.
46 E Main St
Somerville, NJ 08876-2339
Represented By
Jarret P. Hitchings
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Monday, March 27, 2023
8 8 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/27 3:40 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge - Judge Thomas M Horan added to case. Involvement of Judge John T. Dorsey Terminated (SJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 06/16 2:54 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Hamon Deltak, Inc.. (Hitchings, Jarret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Statement of Financial Affairs
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
6 6 claims Request for Service of Notices Wed 04/27 4:31 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Synchrony Bank. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
5 5 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 04/26 1:36 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Related [+] An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Hamon Holdings Corporation (Case No. 22-10375 for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 22-10375 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in Hamon Holdings Corporation (Case No. 22-10375 . Order Signed on 4/26/2022. (RC)
Related: [-] ument(s)3
Monday, April 25, 2022
4 4 notice Hearing - Notice Mon 04/25 12:40 PM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of First Day Hearing Related [+] Filed by Hamon Deltak, Inc.. (Hitchings, Jarret)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion Mon 04/25 9:54 AM
Motion for Joint Administration /Debtors' Motion For Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Hamon Deltak, Inc.(Hitchings, Jarret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order
court Case Assigned Mon 04/25 7:46 AM
Judge John T. Dorsey added to case (JS)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 24, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 04/24 10:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-10378 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10713593, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 04/24 10:30 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Hamon Deltak, Inc. . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Hamon Deltak, Inc.. (Hitchings, Jarret)
Related: [-]